EP2523977 - METHOD OF CHLORINATING POLYSACCHARIDES OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Universität Siegen Dezemat 3 Herrengarten 3 57068 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Universität Siegen Dezemat 3 Herrengarten 3 57068 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANSTRÖM, Mari Lameystaße 24 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
MORMANN, Werner Zum Wolfsloch 30 57223 Kreuztal / DE | 03 /
FRANK, Petra Berliner Straße 30 57223 Kreuztal / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2012/47] | 01 /
GRANSTRÖM, Mari Lameystaße 24 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
MORMANN, Werner Brucknerweg 6 57076 Siegen / DE | |||
03 /
FRANK, Petra Berliner Straße 30 57223 Kreuztal / DE | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Jürgen, et al BASF Personal Care and Nutrition GmbH Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/47] | Application number, filing date | 11700099.2 | 12.01.2011 | WO2011EP50305 | Priority number, date | EP20100150853 | 15.01.2010 Original published format: EP 10150853 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086082 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523977 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08B1/00, C08B15/00, C08B37/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
C08B15/00 (EP,KR);
C08B1/00 (KR);
C08B1/003 (EP);
C08B37/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CHLORINIERUNG VON POLYSACCHARIDEN ODER OLIGOSACCHARIDEN | [2012/47] | English: | METHOD OF CHLORINATING POLYSACCHARIDES OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES | [2012/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHLORATION DE POLYSACCHARIDES OU D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES | [2012/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 05.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]GB1449891 (AQUITAINE PETROLE) [X] 1,2,5-14 * example 1 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 3; | [Y]WO2007101813 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - "AN IMPROVED PROCEDURE FOR THE PREPARATION OF CHLORINATED CELLULOSE WITH METHANESULFONYL CHLORIDE IN A DIMETHYLFORMAMIDE-CHLORAL- PYRIDINE MIXTURE", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19900701), vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 2223 - 2227, XP000162921 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * page 2225; table - * | [X] - FURUHATA K-I ET AL, "Chlorination of cellulose with N-chlorosuccinimide-triphenylphosphine under homogeneous conditions in lithium chloride-N,N-dimethylacetamide", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH 1992 JUN 4 NL, (19920604), vol. 230, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90518-4, pages 151 - 164, XP002636646 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * pages 157,162, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90518-4 | [X] - SAKAMOTO M ET AL, "Regioselective chlorination of chitin with N- chlorosuccinimide-triphenylphosphine under homogeneous conditions in lithium chloride-N,N-dimethylacetamide", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 265, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/0008-6215(94)00230-4, ISSN 0008-6215, (19941216), pages 271 - 280, (19941216), XP026638261 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * page 279 - page 280 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(94)00230-4 | [X] - HOW T ET AL, "Chlorination of chitin with sulfuryl chloride under homogeneous conditions", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (19970501), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0144-8617(97)00035-0, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 13 - 18, XP004083147 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(97)00035-0 | by applicant | WO2007101811 | WO2007101812 | WO2007101813 | WO2008000666 | WO2008043837 | WO2005113702 | WO03029329 | WO2007076979 | WO2006000197 | WO2007128268 |