EP2526173 - PROCESS FOR CRACKING A HYDROCARBON-CONTAINING FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For:SM
Shell Oil Company One Shell Plaza P.O. Box 2463 Houston, TX 77252-2463 / US | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For:SM
Shell Oil Company One Shell Plaza P.O. Box 2463 Houston, TX 77252-2463 / US | ||
For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILAM, Stanley Nemec 1622 Longacre Drive Houston Texas 77055 / US | 02 /
REYNOLDS, Michael Anthony 20410 Ivory Creek Lane Katy Texas 77450 / US | 03 /
WELLINGTON, Scott Lee 5109 Aspen Street Bellaire Texas 77401 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 11701345.8 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011US21980 | Priority number, date | US20100297067P | 21.01.2010 Original published format: US 297067 P | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011091211 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2526173 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/06, C10G47/26, B01J27/02, B01J27/04, B01J27/047, B01J27/051, B01J27/057, B01J35/02, C01G3/12, C01G39/06 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
C10G47/26 (EP,US);
B01J27/0515 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J37/009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
B01J37/038 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
C01G19/006 (EP,US);
C01G39/006 (EP,US);
C10G47/06 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/206 (EP,US);
C10G2300/207 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM CRACKEN EINES KOHLENWASSERSTOFFHALTIGEN ROHSTOFFES | [2012/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR CRACKING A HYDROCARBON-CONTAINING FEED | [2012/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRAQUAGE D'UNE CHARGE CONTENANT DES HYDROCARBURES | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2159511 (MATHIAS PIER, et al); | [A]EP0133031 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [X]EP0145105 (GULF RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CO [US]); | [A]US4795731 (PECORARO THERESA A [US], et al); | [A]US4820677 (JACOBSON ALLAN J [US], et al); | [XD]WO2008141830 (ENI SPA [IT], et al); | [XD]WO2008141831 (ENI SPA [IT], et al); | [A]US2009011931 (CHEN KAIDONG [US], et al); | [A]US2009023965 (PEREIRA PEDRO [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008141830 | WO2008141831 |