EP2663605 - AEROSOL FOR TRANSFERRING THERMAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Durmus, Zeynel Flotowstr. 10 10555 Berlin / DE | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARI, Adem Dahlmannstr. 21 10629 Berlin / DE | [2014/04] |
Former [2013/47] | 01 /
SARI, Adem Bellevuestr.1 10785 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Boeckh, Tobias Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Boeckh, Tobias Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11701774.9 | 14.01.2011 | WO2011EP50465 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012095182 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663605 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/08 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
C09K5/08 (EP,US);
F24S10/30 (EP);
F24S10/70 (EP);
F24T10/13 (EP);
F24T10/30 (EP,US);
F28F23/00 (EP);
F24D13/04 (EP);
F24H3/04 (EP);
F24H3/062 (EP);
F24S2023/84 (EP);
F24S23/74 (EP,US);
Y02E10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | AEROSOL ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG THERMISCHER ENERGIE | [2013/47] | English: | AEROSOL FOR TRANSFERRING THERMAL ENERGY | [2013/47] | French: | AÉROSOL POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005242323 (LECK THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0025] , [0026] , [0031] , [0042] - [0045] - [0065] * [I] 6; | [XI]US4027007 (MESSINA RALPH P) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, lines 5-6 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 6 * * example 1 * [I] 2,6; | [X]JPH08218061 (SUZUKI SHOKAN KK, et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0018] - [0023] - [0027] , [0029]; tables 1-3 *; | [E]WO2011006495 (BORONTEC AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-5,7-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 23 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 10 * | [I] - "Borate Insecticide Products Catalog", (20021031), pestproducts.com, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20021031205709/http://www.pestproducts.com/borate.htm, (20111009), XP002660917 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0064586 |