EP2531268 - FRACTIONATING METHOD AND FRACTIONATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖVER, Hans-Martin Bremer Strasse 30 21244 21244 / DE | 02 /
LIPKA, Georg Ludgerus Strasse 25 59302 Oelde / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2014/29] |
Former [2012/50] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11702425.7 | 27.01.2011 | WO2011EP51169 | Priority number, date | DE20101006618 | 01.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010006618 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011092260 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531268 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B04B15/12 (EP);
B01D9/0013 (EP);
B01D9/004 (EP);
B01D9/0059 (EP);
B04B1/08 (EP);
C11B7/0016 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | FRAKTIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND FRAKTIONIERUNGSANLAGE | [2012/50] | English: | FRACTIONATING METHOD AND FRACTIONATING SYSTEM | [2012/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE FRACTIONNEMENT | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2807411 (AYRES ARTHUR U) [X] 1,4,10,18-23 * figures 2-4 * [Y] 2,3,11-17 [I] 2,3,11-13; | [XYI]DE19719776 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,10,18-23 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 5; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,11-17 [I] 2,3,11-13; | [Y]FR1528593 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [Y] 2,3,11-17 * page 2; figures 1,2,2a *; | [Y]DE3203524 (SELWIG & LANGE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11-17 * figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US3632616 (KASSABIAN RICHARD) [X] 5 * column 4, line 31 - line 39; figure 1 * [Y] 6,18-30 [I] 6-9; | [XYI]US2296456 (HENRY SCHUTTE AUGUST) [X] 5 * figure 1 * [Y] 6,18-30 [I] 6-9; | [Y]US2003054084 (HRUSCHKA STEFFEN M [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]US2301109 (BENJAMIN CLAYTON) [Y] 6,18-30 * column 2, line 7 - line 21; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | - A. TIRTIAUX ET AL., "Trockene Mehrfachfraktionierung - Ein kostengünstiges Umwandlungsverfahren", FAT. SCI. TECHNOL., (70719), vol. 93, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1002/lipi.19910931104, page 432, XP000236784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/lipi.19910931104 |