EP2532039 - BATTERY CELL COMPRISING A SAFETY VALVE FOR VENTING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SAFETY VALVE IN A BATTERY HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states SB Limotive Company Ltd 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 443-731 / KR | ||
For all designated states SB LiMotive Germany GmbH Kruppstrasse 20 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUB, Matthias Friedrichstr. 6 71711 Steinheim / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Bee, Joachim, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentalabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/14] | Bee, Joachim, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH Abteilung C/IPE Wernerstr. 1 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11702587.4 | 04.01.2011 | WO2011EP50044 | Priority number, date | DE20101001533 | 03.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010001533 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011095369 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532039 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532039 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12, // H01M2/04, H01M2/02, H01M10/052 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H01M50/3425 (EP);
H01M50/147 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M50/103 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | H01M2/12, H01M2/04, H01M2/02, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEZELLE MIT EINEM SICHERHEITSVENTIL ZUR ENTLÜFTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SICHERHEITSVENTILS IN EINEM BATTERIEGEHÄUSE | [2012/50] | English: | BATTERY CELL COMPRISING A SAFETY VALVE FOR VENTING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SAFETY VALVE IN A BATTERY HOUSING | [2012/50] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE PRÉSENTANT UNE SOUPAPE DE SÛRETÉ POUR LA VENTILATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SOUPAPE DE SÛRETÉ DANS UN BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 26.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2011 | AL | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | MT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | RS | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | AT | 04.01.2016 | GB | 04.01.2016 | IE | 04.01.2016 | LU | 04.01.2016 | BE | 31.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
AT | 04.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
AT | 04.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
AT | 04.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
AT | 04.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
AT | 04.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10261391 (SONY CORP) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]US6159631 (THOMPSON SEAN [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 3, line 5 - line 12; figure 8a * * column 4, line 38 - line 48 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 14 * * column 8, line 7 - line 44 * * column 9, line 23 - line 48 *; | [XI]EP1168468 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0031] * [I] 8,10; | [XI]EP1321993 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,9 * figures 1-19, 21-39 * * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 10; | [XI]US6696196 (EILERS DEREK [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 13; figures 2-5 * [I] 4,10; | [XI]US2005069760 (SOMATOMO YOSHIKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043] * [I] 10; | [XAI]US2009047572 (PYNENBURG RORY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0027] * [A] 5 [I] 4,7,10; | [EL]EP2273584 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,2,4,6,9,10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-7 *[L] | by applicant | DE3443453 | EP1933403 |