EP2538986 - AN INTRA-ARTICULAR SUPPLEMENT FOR USE IN TREATING JOINT DISEASES AND INJURIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/01] | AN INTRA-ARTICULAR SUPPLEMENTATION METHOD FOR TREATING JOINT DISEASES AND INJURIES | ||
[2014/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Liège Patent Department Avenue Pré-Aily, 4 4031 Angleur (Liege) / BE | For all designated states Kitozyme S.A. Parc Industriel des Hauts Sarts, Zone 2 Rue Haute Claire 4 4040 Herstal / BE | [2014/49] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Université de Liège Interface Entreprises Université Antheunis Nicole Avenue Pré-Aily, 4 4031 Angleur (Liege) / BE | ||
For all designated states Kitozyme S.A. Parc Industriel des Hauts Sarts, Zone 2 Rue Haute Claire 4 4040 Herstal / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENROTIN, Yves Aux Grands Champs 63 B-4052 Baufays / BE | 02 /
SANCHEZ, Christelle Sur les Charneux 382 B-4870 Fraipont / BE | 03 /
OPRENYESZK, Frédéric Rue Adolphe Marquet 11 B-4680 Hermee / BE | 04 /
DRION, Pierre Saint Germain 14A B-4860 Soiron / BE | [2013/01] | Application number, filing date | 11702660.9 | 11.02.2011 | WO2011EP52020 | Priority number, date | EP20100154712 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10154712 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011104133 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2538986 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2538986 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/26, A61L27/52, A61L27/20, A61L27/38 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A61L27/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/06 (KR,US);
A61K31/722 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/734 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K9/14 (KR,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/3817 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/20, C08L5/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (US,EP);
A61L27/26, C08L5/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/26, C08L5/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/01] | A61L27/20, A61L27/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAARTIKULÄRE ERGÄNZUNG FÜR DIE VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON GELENKERKRANKUNGEN UND GELENKVERLETZUNGEN | [2014/26] | English: | AN INTRA-ARTICULAR SUPPLEMENT FOR USE IN TREATING JOINT DISEASES AND INJURIES | [2014/26] | French: | SUPPLEMÉNT INTRA-ARTICULAIRE POUR UTILISATIONS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OSTÉOARTHRITE ET DE LÉSIONS DES ARTICULATIONS | [2014/26] |
Former [2013/01] | INTRAARTIKULÄRES ZUFUHRVERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GELENKERKRANKUNGEN UND -VERLETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2013/01] | AN INTRA-ARTICULAR SUPPLEMENTATION METHOD FOR TREATING JOINT DISEASES AND INJURIES | ||
Former [2013/01] | PROCÉDÉ D'APPORT COMPLÉMENTAIRE INTRA-ARTICULAIRE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ET LÉSIONS ARTICULAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 20.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Gesval S.A. Avenue Pré-Aily 4 B60 4031 Angleur / BE | Date: | 25.09.2014 | ID: | 01 02/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Synolyne Avenue de l'Hôpital 11 4000 Liège / BE | Date: | 07.10.2014 | [2014/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MK | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | RS | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | SM | 03.12.2014 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MK | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BG | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 03.12.2014 | |
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 03.12.2014 | |
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RS | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004047912 (BARDONNET RAPHAEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, paragraph 23 - page 2, paragraph 57 * * claim - *; | [A]US2006280797 (SHOICHET MOLLY S [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, paragraphs 8-10 * * page 4, paragraphs 45-46 * * page 5, paragraph 54 ** claim - *; | [A]WO2007135114 (UNIV DEGLI STUDI TRIESTE [IT], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 6 * * page 15, lines 4-27; example 12 * * page 25, lines 7-28 * * claim - *; | [A] - SEDA TÄ+-Ä LÄ+- R ET AL, "Evaluation of alginate-chitosan semi IPNs as cartilage scaffolds", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20081106), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 699 - 709, XP019680168 [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [02.3] , [ 2.5] , [ 2.5.1] , [ 3.4.1] * | [A] - BARUCH, L.; MACHLUF, M., "Alginate-Chitosan Complex Coacervation for Cell Encapsulation: Effect on Mechanical Properties and on Long-Term Viability", BIOPOLYMERS, (20060321), vol. 82, pages 570 - 579, XP002593055 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIP.20509 | by applicant | WO2007135114 |