EP2545303 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A GEARBOX BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULBRICHT, Markus Karlsdorfer Str. 29 88069 Tettnang / DE | [2013/03] | Application number, filing date | 11703667.3 | 14.02.2011 | WO2011EP52087 | Priority number, date | DE20101002763 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010002763 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110399 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545303 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04, F16H3/12, F16H59/42, F16H59/40, F16H59/46, F16H61/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
F16H61/0403 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/406 (EP,US);
F16H2003/123 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0078 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0411 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0474 (EP,US);
F16H59/40 (EP,US);
F16H59/42 (EP,US);
F16H59/46 (EP,US);
F16H61/682 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER GETRIEBEBREMSE | [2013/03] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A GEARBOX BRAKE | [2013/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN FREIN D'ENGRENAGE | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE19652916 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [YD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5910069 (MARKYVECH RONALD K [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US6503171 (BOECKMANN GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YP]DE102008042385 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [YP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0026] , [0040]; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | DE10305254 | DE10330517 | DE19652916 |