EP2526382 - LOCATION AWARE RECOMMENDATION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Saumitra Mohan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Rajarshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
KHORASHADI, Behrooz 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11703761.4 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011US22126 | Priority number, date | US20100846687 | 29.07.2010 Original published format: US 846687 | US20100297666P | 22.01.2010 Original published format: US 297666 P | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011091306 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526382 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G01C21/36, G01C21/34 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/3453 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/36 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | G01C21/20, G01C21/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | ORTSBEWUSSTE EMPFEHLUNGSMASCHINE | [2012/48] | English: | LOCATION AWARE RECOMMENDATION ENGINE | [2012/48] | French: | MOTEUR DE RECOMMANDATION SENSIBLE À LA LOCALISATION | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 04.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005165543 (YOKOTA TATSUO [US]) [Y] 19,29 * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US2006146719 (SOBEK ADAM D [US], et al) [A] 2,11-31* claims 1-6 *; | [X]JP2007024624 (NAVITIME JAPAN CO LTD) [X] 2,11,21 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0090] *; | [XYI]US2007219706 (SHEYNBLAT LEN [US]) [X] 2,11-18,21-28,31 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0030] , [0051] , [0052] , [0035] , [0044] , [0064] , [0060] , [0037]; figure 11 * [Y] 19,29 [I] 1,3-10,20,30 | Examination | JP2007093229 | DE102006057428 | US2008248815 | JP2009229108 |