EP2539916 - HIGH-FREQUENCY SUPPLY OF A LOAD WITHOUT IMPEDANCE MATCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEID, Oliver Luitpoldstrasse 63 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2013/01] | Application number, filing date | 11703848.9 | 31.01.2011 | WO2011EP51278 | Priority number, date | DE20101008777 | 22.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008777 | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011101226 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539916 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H05H1/46, H03F3/217 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H05H1/46 (EP,US);
H01J37/32009 (EP,US);
H01J37/32027 (EP,US);
H01J37/32045 (EP,US);
H03F3/2178 (EP,US);
H02M1/088 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZVERSORGUNG EINER LAST OHNE IMPEDANZANPASSUNG | [2013/01] | English: | HIGH-FREQUENCY SUPPLY OF A LOAD WITHOUT IMPEDANCE MATCHING | [2013/01] | French: | ALIMENTATION HAUTE FRÉQUENCE D'UNE CHARGE SANS ADAPTATION D'IMPÉDANCE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4994760 (ROEHRS DON P [US]) [Y] 7,8,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP1272014 (ENI TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [IY]US2009278513 (BAHRAMIAN TONY [US], et al) [I] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,12; | [AP] - HEID O ET AL, "Compact Solid State Direct drive RF Linac", ISBN 978-92-9083-352-9, (20100523), pages 4278 - 4280, PROCEEDINGS OF IPAC (2010) KYOTO, JAPAN,, URL: http://accelconf.web.cern.ch/AccelConf/IPAC10/papers/thpd002.pdf, (20110908), XP002658698 [AP] 1-12 * the whole document * |