EP2536299 - EDIBLE BATTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING BATTER-COATED FOODS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newly Weds Foods (Banbury) Limited Lombard Way Banbury Oxfordshire OX16 4TJ / GB | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, David c/o Witwood Food Products Limited Lombard Way Banbury Oxfordshire OX16 4TJ / GB | 02 /
LUKER, Peter c/o Witwood Food Products Limited Lombard Way Banbury Oxfordshire OC16 4TJ / GB | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2012/52] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11704844.7 | 15.02.2011 | [2016/42] | WO2011GB50286 | Priority number, date | GB20100002610 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: GB 201002610 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011101664 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536299 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2536299 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L13/50, A23L17/00, A23L29/10 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A23L17/75 (EP,US);
A23L13/03 (EP,US);
A23L13/57 (EP,US);
A23L29/015 (EP,US);
A23L29/281 (EP,US);
A23P20/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | A23L1/315, A23L1/00, A23L1/325, A23L1/03, A23P1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESSBARE BACKTEIGZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT BACKTEIG UMHÜLLTEN LEBENSMITTELN DAMIT | [2012/52] | English: | EDIBLE BATTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING BATTER-COATED FOODS USING THE SAME | [2012/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PÂTE À FRIRE COMESTIBLE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ALIMENTS ENROBÉS DE PÂTE À FRIRE UTILISANT LESDITES COMPOSITIONS | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2011 | AL | 19.10.2016 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IE | 15.02.2017 | LU | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0445369 (SEIWA TECH LAB [JP]) [Y] 1-72 * page 3, lines 3-43 * * examples 2,4 * * claims 1-9 *; | [YD]US7163707 (KELLEHER STEPHEN D [US], et al) [YD] 1-72 * column 1, lines 17-22 * * column 3, lines 35-43 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 8 * * examples * * claims 1-4,9-19,25-29 *; | [Y]US4900573 (MEYERS MARC A [US], et al) [Y] 1-72 * column 3, lines 18-50 * * column 2, lines 11-18 *; | [XPA]WO2010135272 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XP] 56 * examples 5-7 * * page 2 * * claims 1-14 * [A] 1-55,57-72; | [X] - Anonymous, "Chicken Nuggets", GNPD, Mintel, (20080901), Database accession no. 966941, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP002634567 [X] 56 * the whole document * | [X] - Anonymous, "30% Fat Reduced Fried Prawns", GNPD, Mintel, (20050501), Database accession no. 356829, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP002634568 [X] 56 * the whole document * | [X] - Anonymous, "Crispy Potato Wedges in Batter", GNPD, Mintel, (20050901), Database accession no. 395997, URL: www.gnpd.de, XP002634569 [X] 56 * the whole document * | [XY] - SEYHAN FIRDEVS DOGAN ET AL, "Effects of batters containing different protein types on the quality of deep-fat-fried chicken nuggets", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY ; ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR LEBENSMITTELUNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG A, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050501), vol. 220, no. 5-6, doi:DOI:10.1007/S00217-004-1099-7, ISSN 1438-2385, pages 502 - 508, XP019328088 [X] 56 * pages 502-504 * * page 507 * * figure 6 * [Y] 1-72 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00217-004-1099-7 | [Y] - DONALD E. PSZCZOLA, "New Batters and Breadings", FOOD TECHNOLOGY, (20051001), pages 49 - 60, URL: http://www.proteusindustries.com/news-press/pdfs/IFT_Article.pdf, (20110426), XP002634570 [Y] 1-72 * pages 49-52 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "New coating technology opens door to low fat deep fried food", (20050720), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.foodnavigator.com/content/view/print/52076, (20110426), XP002634571 [Y] 1-72 * the whole document * | [A] - FISZMAN S M ET AL, "Recent developments in coating batters", TRENDS IN FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB, (20031001), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0924-2244(03)00153-5, ISSN 0924-2244, pages 399 - 407, XP004458095 [A] 1-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-2244(03)00153-5 | Examination | - USDA, "Leavening agent", pages 1 - 2, URL: http://ndb.nal.usda.gov/ndb/foods/show/5745?fg=&man=&lfacet=&format=&count=&max=25&offset=&sort=&qlookup=leavening+agent | - USDA, "Leavening agent, cream of tartar", pages 1 - 2, URL: http://ndb.nal.usda.gov/ndb/foods/show/5746?fg=&man=&lfacet=&format=&count=&max=25&offset=&sort=&qlookup=leavening+agent | - USDA, "Salt, table", pages 1 - 2, URL: http://ndb.nal.usda.gov/ndb/foods/show/271?fg=&man=&lfacet=&format=&count=&max=25&offset=&sort=&qlookup=salt | - ERNST BOSSE ET AL., Chemical Leavenig Agents, CFB BUDENHEIM, pages 30 - 31 | by applicant | WO9638054 | US5019406 | US6224921 | US2002001659 | US5217736 | US5232721 | US7163707 | US6005073 | US6288216 | US6451975 | - BALASUBRAMANIAM ET AL., JOURNAL OF FOOD PROCESS ENGINEERING, vol. 20, pages 17 - 29 | - MALLIKARJUNAN ET AL., LEBENSMITTEL-WISSENSCHAFT UND TECHNOLOGIE, (1997), vol. 30, pages 709 - 714 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 64, pages 317 - 322 |