EP2528878 - ZIRCONIA - BASED REFRACTORY PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/49] | REFRACTORY PRODUCT HAVING HIGH ZIRCONIA CONTENT | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et d'Etudes Européen Les Miroirs 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et d'Etudes Européen Les Miroirs 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABODI, Isabelle Le grand Grès 173 rue des Iris F-84300 Cavaillon / FR | 02 /
GAUBIL, Michel 8 rue Alain Fournier F-30133 Les Angles / FR | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/49] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11705267.0 | 28.01.2011 | [2017/42] | WO2011IB50388 | Priority number, date | FR20100050601 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: FR 1050601 | [2012/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092657 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528878 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2528878 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/43, C04B35/657, C04B35/484, C04B35/486, C04B35/48 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C03B5/43 (EP,US);
C04B35/4504 (KR);
C04B35/484 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B35/109 (KR);
C04B35/119 (KR);
C04B35/48 (KR);
C04B35/481 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/653 (KR);
C04B35/657 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3206 (CN);
C04B2235/3208 (CN);
C04B2235/3213 (CN,KR);
C04B2235/3215 (CN);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3232 (CN);
C04B2235/3248 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3272 (CN);
C04B2235/3284 (CN);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/656 (CN);
C04B2235/6567 (CN);
C04B2235/6583 (CN);
C04B2235/66 (CN);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
C04B2235/727 (EP,US);
C04B2235/95 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | C04B35/109, C04B35/48, C04B35/484, C04B35/486, C04B35/653 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERFESTES PRODUKT MIT HOHEM GEHALT AN ZIRKONIUMOXYD. | [2016/19] | English: | ZIRCONIA - BASED REFRACTORY PRODUCT | [2016/19] | French: | PRODUIT REFRACTAIRE A FORTE TENEUR EN ZIRCONE | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/49] | FEUERFESTPRODUKT MIT HOHEM ZIRKONOXIDGEHALT | ||
Former [2012/49] | REFRACTORY PRODUCT HAVING HIGH ZIRCONIA CONTENT | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 11.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | MT | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | GB | 28.01.2018 | IE | 28.01.2018 | LU | 28.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007249481 (GUPTA AMUL [US], et al) [I] 1-7,10-12,14,15 * Abrégé;; paragraphs [0012] , [0013]; examples 12,13; claims 27, 31 *; | [I]US4705763 (HAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-5,8,10,15 * Col. 3, l. 5-6;;; examples S4, S5; claim 1; tables 1-cont. *; | [A]US5466643 (ISHINO TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2009153517 | by applicant | EP0403387 | FR2701022 | WO2009027610 | WO2007099253 | WO2005068393 | JPS63285173 | FR1208577 |