EP2539722 - HOUSING WITH A BACK FACE DESIGNED FOR FIXING ON A SUPPORT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/01] | HOUSING WITH REAR FACE INTENDED TO BE FIXED TO A SUPPORT | ||
[2016/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagemcom Energy & Telecom SAS 250 Route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLLAND, Patrick c/o Sagemcom Energy&Telecom SAS 250 route de l'Empereur F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/01] | 01 /
ROLLAND, Patrick c/o Sagemcom Energy&Telecom SAS 250 route de l'Empereur F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Representative(s) | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane Cabinet Boettcher 5 rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/01] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11705817.2 | 21.02.2011 | [2017/14] | WO2011EP00821 | Priority number, date | FR20100051408 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1051408 | [2013/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011103990 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539722 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539722 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R11/04, E05C3/04, E05B17/20, E05B35/00 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
E05C3/042 (EP,US);
E05B17/2019 (EP,US);
E05B35/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | G01R11/04, E05C3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT MITTELN ZUM BEFESTIGEN AUF EINER TRÄGERPLATTE | [2016/17] | English: | HOUSING WITH A BACK FACE DESIGNED FOR FIXING ON A SUPPORT STRUCTURE | [2016/17] | French: | BOÎTIER AVEC UNE FACE ARRIÈRE DESTINE A ETRE FIXE SUR UN SUPPORT | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/01] | GEHÄUSE MIT AN EINER STÜTZE ZU BEFESTIGENDEN RÜCKSEITE | ||
Former [2013/01] | HOUSING WITH REAR FACE INTENDED TO BE FIXED TO A SUPPORT | ||
Former [2013/01] | BOITIER AVEC UNE FACE ARRIERE DESTINE A ETRE FIXE SUR UN SUPPORT | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2011 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH571800 (LANDIS & GYR AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3048633 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2514224 (SIGNAUX ENTR ELECTRIQUES [FR]) [X] 1,4,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004028223 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |