EP2537388 - ASSISTED STATE TRANSITION OF A USER EQUIPMENT (UE) FOR DELAY SENSITIVE APPLICATIONS WITHIN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Byongyong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
LIN, Yih-Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
ANCHAN, Kirankumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11706073.1 | 09.02.2011 | WO2011US24232 | Priority number, date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 Original published format: US201113012417 | US20100305364P | 17.02.2010 Original published format: US 305364 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2012/52] | US20110012417 | 24.01.2011 | |
US20100305364P | 17.02.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011103008 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537388 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, H04W4/10, H04W76/04 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
H04W4/10 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W76/10 (EP,CN);
H04W80/10 (KR);
H04W88/18 (KR);
H04W76/27 (EP,CN);
H04W76/45 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZTER ZUSTANDSÜBERGANG EINES BENUTZERGERÄTES FÜR VERZÖGERUNGSSENSITIVE ANWENDUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/52] | English: | ASSISTED STATE TRANSITION OF A USER EQUIPMENT (UE) FOR DELAY SENSITIVE APPLICATIONS WITHIN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2012/52] | French: | TRANSITION D'ÉTAT ASSISTÉE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) POUR APPLICATIONS SENSIBLES AU RETARD DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 12.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2152031 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0075]; figures 7A, 7B * [Y] 2,3; | [X]US2005141541 (CUNY RENAUD [FI], et al) [X] 1,21-23 * abstract * * figures 7-9 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0088] *; | [X]US2007192439 (BHASKARAN HAMSINI [US]) [X] 1,21-23 * abstract * * figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]US2006148535 (SCHAEFER BRADLEY R [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]US2006146743 (CROCKER RONALD T [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * | by applicant | US20100301929 | US20100297963 | US20100781666 | US20090180640 |