EP2552914 - BENZONAPHTHYRIDINAMINES AS AUTOTAXIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAEHLE, Wolfgang Neuweg 14C 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
SCHULTZ, Melanie Heinrich-Fuhr-Strasse 17 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
SCHIEMANN, Kai Am Roedergraben 8 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [2013/06] | Application number, filing date | 11706181.2 | 28.02.2011 | [2015/46] | WO2011EP00964 | Priority number, date | EP20100003282 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10003282 | [2013/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011116867 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552914 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552914 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P35/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZONAPHTHYRIDINAMINE ALS AUTOTAXIN-INHIBITOREN | [2013/06] | English: | BENZONAPHTHYRIDINAMINES AS AUTOTAXIN INHIBITORS | [2013/06] | French: | BENZONAPHTHYRIDINAMINES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'AUTOTAXINE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2011 | AL | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | MT | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | RS | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | AT | 28.02.2016 | IE | 28.02.2016 | LU | 28.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
AL | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
AT | 28.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
IT | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 11.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1186061 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [X] 14 * column 1; compound I * * table 1 * * example 9 *; | [X]EP0997462 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 14 * examples 10,11,15,19 *; | [X] - FRANCO GATTA ET AL, "Synthesis of 10-Amino-1,2,3,4-tetrahydrobenzo[b][1,6]naphthyridines and Related Derivatives", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, (19960101), vol. 33, doi:DOI:10.1002/JHET.5570330642, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1807 - 1814, XP009132640 [X] 14 * scheme 1, Verbindungen 11, 18; scheme 1, Verbindungen 6-10, 13-17 mit R1=H * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570330642 | [A] - HOEGLUND ADRIENNE B ET AL, "Characterization of non-lipid autotaxin inhibitors.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 15 JAN 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20005724, (20100115), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 1464-3391, pages 769 - 776, XP002637116 [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMC.2009.11.056 | by applicant | US3637706 | US3647800 | US3674790 | US4751305 | US4808612 | US4816464 | JPH03218359 | WO9900388 | WO0035918 | JP2002088081 | WO2004067513 | WO0061186 | WO0050032 | - XU ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 1, page 1223 | - XU ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 309, page 933 | - TOKUMURA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, page 39436 | - UMEZU-GOZO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 158, page 227 | - TIGYI ET AL., PROG. LIPID RES, (2003), vol. 42, page 498 | - MILLS ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, page 582 | - LYNCH ET AL., PROST. LIPID MED, (2001), vol. 64, page 33 | - CONTOS ET AL., MOL. PHARM., (2000), vol. 58, page 1188 | - SANO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, page 21197 | - AOKI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 277, page 48737 | - GODING ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1998), vol. 161, page 11 | - GOTO ET AL., J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 92, page 1115 | - NAM ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, page 241 | - NAM ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, page 6938 | - FOLKMAN, NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2007), vol. 6, pages 273 - 286 | - PENG ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 1634 - 1640 | - YAMATO M ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 1295 - 1300 | - YAMATO M ET AL., CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1990), vol. 38, no. 11, pages 3048 - 3052 | - SKOTNICKI JS ET AL., MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 254 - 252 | - PIRRUNG MC ET AL., CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, no. 9, pages 621 - 626 | - YOUSSEF; KHAIRIA M ET AL., BULLETIN OF THE FACULTY OF PHARMACY, (1995), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 33 - 39 | - AI-AZHAR, BULLETIN OF SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 99 - 112 | - WERMUTH CG ET AL., The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), pages 671 - 696 | - BUNDGAARD H, A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1991), pages 131 - 191 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der Organischen Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG | - Organic Reaktions, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry | WO2009EP07930 |