EP2532041 - ELECTRIC ENERGY STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | [2014/13] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Wissenschaft E.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFFER, Kai Waldstr. 30 70771 Leinfelden / DE | 02 /
BRIX, Jonathan Adam-Kraft-Str. 1 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11706739.7 | 04.02.2011 | WO2011EP00536 | Priority number, date | DE20101007076 | 06.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010007076 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011095355 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2532041 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532041 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2532041 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H01M6/50, // H01M10/44 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
H01M10/4207 (EP);
H01M50/502 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H01M6/5011 (EP);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H01M10/448 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | H01M2/20, H01M10/42, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIESPEICHER | [2012/50] | English: | ELECTRIC ENERGY STORE | [2012/50] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 03.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2011 | AL | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MK | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | RS | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | SM | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 04.02.2014 | LU | 04.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9622625 (NORVIK TRACTION INC [CA]) [Y] 11* page 17, line 24 - page 19, line 26; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US5652499 (MORITA HIDEYO [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * column 6, line 47 - line 59 * * column 9, line 1 - line 11 * * column 10, line 13 - line 23 * * figures 1-16 *; | [XYI]US2008274400 (DIXON JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10 * the whole document * [Y] 11 [I] 3,5,9; | [Y]US2009066291 (TIEN JENN-YANG [TW], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0041]; figure 9 *; | [XYI]WO2010007681 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9 * the whole document * [Y] 11 [I] 2,3,6,10; | [XP]WO2010109879 (ITOCHU CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2302724 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3702591 | DE4408740 | DE102007038532 |