EP2531809 - SYSTEM FOR PROGRAMMING AND LIGHTING ELECTRONIC DETONATORS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davey Bickford Le Moulin Gaspard 89550 Héry / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Davey Bickford Le Moulin Gaspard 89550 Hery / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUYON, Franck 1 allée des Vosges F-89000 Auxerre / FR | 02 /
TROUSSELLE, Raphaël 136 rue de Paris F-89000 Auxerre / FR | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/50] | Le Tourneau, Augustin Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée B. P. 237 F-75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11706885.8 | 28.01.2011 | WO2011FR50176 | Priority number, date | FR20100050717 | 02.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1050717 | [2012/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011095730 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531809 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531809 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F42D1/05, F42D1/055 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
F42D1/05 (EP,US);
F42D1/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR PROGRAMMIERUNG UND ZÜNDUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN SPRENGZÜNDERN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2012/50] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROGRAMMING AND LIGHTING ELECTRONIC DETONATORS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2012/50] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROGRAMMATION ET DE MISE A FEU DE DETONATEURS ELECTRONIQUES, PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 26.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 08.01.2014 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | RS | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | LU | 28.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MK | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9745696 (DAVEY BICKFORD [FR], et al) [AD] 1,8 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]WO2008074071 (GLOBAL TRACKING SOLUTIONS PTY [AU], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 8 * * figure - *; | [A]US2009145321 (RUSSELL DAVID WAYNE [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [A]WO2006076777 (ORICA EXPLOSIVES TECH PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 20, line 15 - page 21, line 27 * * figure - * | by applicant | WO9745696 |