EP2539096 - DEVICE FOR TREATING THE NARROW SURFACES, IN PARTICULAR, OF PLATE-SHAPED WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/01] | DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE NARROW SURFACES OF PREFERABLY BOARD-SHAPED WORKPIECES | ||
[2013/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Homag Holzbearbeitungssysteme AG Homagstrasse 3-5 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATHGEBER, Peter Albblick 15 72280 Dornstetten / DE | 02 /
KALMBACH, Wilhelm Hölderlinweg 2 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11707127.4 | 22.02.2011 | WO2011EP52580 | Priority number, date | DE20101009525 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010009525 | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011104221 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539096 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539096 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23C3/12, B23C5/12, B27D5/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
B23C3/126 (EP);
B27D5/006 (EP);
B23C2220/40 (EP);
B23C2260/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEARBEITEN DER SCHMALFLÄCHEN VON BEVORZUGT PLATTENFÖRMIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN | [2013/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING THE NARROW SURFACES, IN PARTICULAR, OF PLATE-SHAPED WORKPIECES | [2013/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES SURFACES ETROITES, EN PARTICULIER, DE PIECES EN FORME DE PLAQUE | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/01] | DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE NARROW SURFACES OF PREFERABLY BOARD-SHAPED WORKPIECES | ||
Former [2013/01] | DISPOSITIF POUR L'USINAGE DES CHANTS DE PIÈCES PRÉFÉRENTIELLEMENT DE FORME PLATE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2011 | AL | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | RS | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | IE | 22.02.2014 | LU | 22.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | FR | 24.03.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0587102 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 4 - line 12 *; | [A]DE2726610 (HORNBERGER MASCHBAU GMBH) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP2072201 (BRANDT KANTENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0446907 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document * | by applicant | EP20080170074 |