EP2536869 - CONSTANT VOLUME CLOSURE VALVE FOR VAPOR PHASE DEPOSITION SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astron Fiamm Safety 35, Rue Pasteur ZI Toulon Est BP 320 La Farlède 83077 Toulon / FR | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUSSERT-VIDALET, Bruno 19 Rue Notos 83100 Toulon / FR | 02 /
GUERARD, Cédric 61 Avenue Alphonse Denis F-83400 Hyeres / FR | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 11707362.7 | 15.02.2011 | WO2011EP52173 | Priority number, date | US20100305606P | 18.02.2010 Original published format: US 305606 P | FR20100051100 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1051100 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011101326 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536869 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2536869 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, C23C16/44 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
C23C16/45587 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/455 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILVERSCHLUSS MIT KONSTANTEM VOLUMEN FÜR EINE AUFDAMPFQUELLE | [2012/52] | English: | CONSTANT VOLUME CLOSURE VALVE FOR VAPOR PHASE DEPOSITION SOURCE | [2012/52] | French: | VANNE D'OBTURATION A VOLUME CONSTANT D'UNE SOURCE DE DEPOT EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2013/27] |
Former [2012/52] | VANNE DE FERMETURE À VOLUME CONSTANT POUR UNE SOURCE DE DÉPÔT EN PHASE VAPEUR | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2011 | AL | 08.01.2014 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | RS | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | IE | 15.02.2014 | LU | 15.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MK | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.02.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3058842 (KAHAN GEORGE J, et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5431735 (BRIONES FERNANDO F [ES]) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0989200 (LEYBOLD SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032] *; | [A]GB2342929 (LEYBOLD SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004007793 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2a, 4 *; | [A]WO2004050938 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure - *; | [A]US6830626 (SMITH GARY L [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2005061244 (HEIN STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2007089676 (KLEMM GUNTER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure - * |