EP2525846 - CARTRIDGE INTERFACE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medimop Medical Projects Ltd. 17 Hatidhar St. P.O. Box 2499 43665 Ra'anana / IL | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABIRI, Oz Nahal Natof 775 71799 Macabim-Reut / IL | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 11707942.6 | 19.01.2011 | WO2011US21605 | Priority number, date | US20100689250 | 19.01.2010 Original published format: US 689250 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011090956 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2525846 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2525846 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
A61M5/14566 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (US);
A61M5/2425 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14506 (US);
A61M5/1456 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG EINER KASSETTENSCHNITTSTELLE | [2012/48] | English: | CARTRIDGE INTERFACE ASSEMBLY | [2012/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE INTERFACE DE CARTOUCHE | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14171477.4 / EP2774637 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2011 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | IE | 19.01.2016 | LU | 19.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.01.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.01.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.01.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.01.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2009044401 (GROSS YOSSI [IL], et al) [XD] 1-5,7,13 * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 14 * * page 28, line 22 - page 29, line 39; figures 6,12 * [Y] 9,10; | [XI]US6800071 (MCCONNELL SUSAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 48 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 17; figure 9 * [I] 7; | [Y]US2008097381 (MOBERG SHELDON B [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0108] - [0110] *; | [A]WO0187384 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9307922 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 9,10 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 20; figure 7 * | by applicant | WO2009044401 | WO2008IL01312 | US20080244666 |