EP2543066 - THERMAL VIAS IN AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT PACKAGE WITH AN EMBEDDED DIE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWEENEY, Fifin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Milind P. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
VELEZ, Mario Francisco 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
GASTELUM, Damion B. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/02] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11708620.7 | 28.02.2011 | [2018/34] | WO2011US26539 | Priority number, date | US20100714918 | 01.03.2010 Original published format: US 714918 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011109310 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2543066 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2543066 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L23/498, H01L25/10, H01L23/367, H01L23/538, H01L23/00, H01L25/03, H01L21/683 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/3677 (EP,US);
H01L23/367 (KR);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L23/498 (KR);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L25/03 (EP,US);
H01L25/065 (KR);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2518 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/82001 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/25 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01087 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2013/02] | H01L23/498, H01L25/065, H01L25/10, H01L23/367 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHE KONTAKTBOHRUNGEN IN EINEM IC-GEHÄUSE MIT ENGEBETTETEM CHIP | [2018/34] | English: | THERMAL VIAS IN AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT PACKAGE WITH AN EMBEDDED DIE | [2013/02] | French: | TROUS DE RACCORDEMENT THERMIQUES DANS UN BOÎTIER DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ AVEC DES PUCES INTÉGRÉS | [2018/10] |
Former [2013/02] | THERMISCHE KONTAKTBOHRUNGEN N IN EINEM IC-GEHÄUSE MIT ENGEBETTETEM CHIP | ||
Former [2013/02] | TROUS DE RACCORDEMENT THERMIQUES DANS UN BOÎTIER DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ AVEC DÉ INTÉGRÉ | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2011 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6265771 (FERENCE THOMAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 5a *; | [IA]EP1256980 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [I] 1-10 * figure 9 * [A] 11-17; | [IA]US2004119149 (YIN PANG HAWK [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 1 * [A] 11-17; | [IA]US2004125578 (KONISHI SATORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 7f * [A] 11-17; | [A]US2007018312 (JO SANG-GUI [KR]) [A] 1-17* figure 8 *; | [IA]US2007176298 (OSONE YASUO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 1 * [A] 11-17; | [A]US2009250809 (YOSHIDA YUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-17 * figure 10 * | Examination | US2009302445 |