EP2542568 - MOLECULAR ENGINEERING OF A FLORAL INDUCER FOR CROP IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Warwick University House Kirby Corner Road Coventry CV4 8UW / GB | [2014/49] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states The University Of Warwick University House Kirby Corner Road Coventry CV4 8UW / GB | ||
For all designated states Plant Bioscience Limited Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Yiguo The University of Warwick Wellesbourne Warwick Warwickshire CV35 9EF / GB | 02 /
JACKSON, Steve School of Life Sciences University of Warwick Wellesbourne Warwick Warwickshire CV35 9EF / GB | 03 /
LI, Chunyang Wellesbourne Campus School of Life Sciences University of Warwick Warwick Warwickshire CV35 9EF / GB | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Barbara Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Fleck, Barbara Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11709173.6 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011GB50440 | Priority number, date | GB20100003702 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: GB 201003702 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011107808 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542568 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12N15/82 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/827 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE MANIPULATION EINES BLÜTENAUSLÖSERS FÜR VERBESSERTE KULTURPFLANZEN | [2013/02] | English: | MOLECULAR ENGINEERING OF A FLORAL INDUCER FOR CROP IMPROVEMENT | [2013/02] | French: | INGÉNIERIE MOLÉCULAIRE D'UN INDUCTEUR DE FLORAISON POUR UNE AMÉLIORATION DE RÉCOLTE | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 16.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 09.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9953070 (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]) [A] 1-5,12-31 * page 43, line 5 - line 7; claims 11-13, 24, 32, 33,34, 39 *; | [A]WO2004067723 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-5,12-31 * figure 1; example 8; tables 1,4 *; | [A] - HANZAWA YOSHIE ET AL, "A single amino acid converts a repressor to an activator of flowering", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (200505), vol. 102, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7748 - 7753, XP002633034 [A] 1-5,12-31 * the whole document, especially: abstract, figure 2* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0500932102 | [A] - TURCK FRANZISKA ET AL, "Regulation and identity of florigen: FLOWERING LOCUS T moves center stage", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PLANT BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 59, ISSN 1040-2519, pages 573 - 594, XP002633035 [A] 1-5,12-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/ANNUREV.ARPLANT.59.032607.092755 | by applicant | US6225530 | US5565350 | WO0015815 | - LI C; ZHANG K; ZENG X; JACKSON S; ZHOU Y; HONG Y, "A cis element within Flowering Locus T mRNA determines its mobility and facilitates trafficking of heterologous viral RNA", J VIROL, (2009), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.02346-08, pages 3540 - 3548, XP055322897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.02346-08 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2004), pages 630 - 636 | - BARTLETT J G; ALVES S C; SMEDLEY M; SNAPE J W; HARWOOD W A, "High-throughput Agrobacterium-mediated barley transformation", PLANT METHODS, (2008), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1186/1746-4811-4-22, page 22, XP021045262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1746-4811-4-22 | - HARWOOD WA; ROSS SM; CILENTO P; SNAPE JW, "The effect of DNA/gold particle preparation technique, and particle bombardment device, on the transformation of barley (Hordeum vulgare)", EUPHYTICA, (2000), vol. 111, pages 67 - 76 | - HELLENS RP; EDWARDS EA; LEYLAND NR; BEAN S; MULLINEAUX PM, "pGreen: a versatile and flexible binary Ti vector for Agrobacterium-mediated plant transformation", PLANT MOL BIOL, (2000), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1006496308160, pages 819 - 832, XP002959415 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006496308160 | - TINGAY S; MCELROY D; KALLA R; FIEG S; WANG M; THORNTON S; BRETTELL R, "Agrobacterium tumefaciens-mediated barley transformation", PLANT J, (1997), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.11061369.x, pages 1369 - 1376, XP009080096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.11061369.x | - ZEEVAART, J. A. D., ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1976), vol. 27, pages 321 - 348 | - CORBESIER, L.; COUPLAND, G. J., EXP. BOT., (2006), vol. 57, pages 3395 - 3403 | - TATADA, S.; GOTO, K., PLANT CELL, (2003), vol. 15, pages 2856 - 2865 | - ABE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1052 - 1056 | - AN, H. ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 131, pages 3615 - 3626 | - WIGGE, P. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1056 - 1059 | - CORBESIER, L. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 316, pages 1030 - 1033 | - GIAVALISCO, P. ET AL., PROTEOMICS, (2006), vol. 6, pages 896 - 909 | - LIFSCHITZ, E. ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 6398 - 6403 | - TAMAKI, S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 316, pages 1033 - 1036 | - LIN, M. K. ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2007), vol. 19, pages 1488 - 1506 | - LI, C. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2009), vol. 83, pages 3540 - 3548 | - TAKAHASHI, Y. ET AL., PNAS, (2009), vol. 106, pages 4555 - 4560 | - HANZAWA, Y.; MONEY, T.; BRADLEY, D., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, pages 7748 - 7753 | - KHUSH , G. S., NAT. REV. GENET, (2001), vol. 2, pages 815 - 822 | - TINGAY ET AL., PLANT J., (1997), vol. 11, pages 1369 - 1376 |