EP2528993 - MIXTURE OF LIQUID-CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS, SYSTEM OF THREE LIQUID-CRYSTAL MIXTURES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braster SA Ul. Cichy Ogród 7 05-850 Ozarów Mazowiecki / PL | [2013/17] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Braster SA Al. Jana Pawla II 12 02-124 Warszawa / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPIEN, Jacek Bernard ul. Organistów 19 02-857 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
JAREMEK, Henryk ul. Rostworowskiego 28/3 01-496 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
PIELAK, Grzegorz Franciszek ul. Graniczna 2 Izbica 05-140 Serock / PL | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Witek, Rafal WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Witek, Rafal WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Rudolfa Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 11709228.8 | 28.01.2011 | WO2011PL50005 | Priority number, date | PL20100390320 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: PL 39032010 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011093734 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528993 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2528993 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/36, C09K19/26, G01K11/16 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
C09K19/26 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/00 (US);
G01K11/16 (KR);
G01K11/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNG AUS FLÜSSIGKRISTALLVERBINDUNGEN, SYSTEM AUS DREI FLÜSSIGKRISTALLMISCHUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2012/49] | English: | MIXTURE OF LIQUID-CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS, SYSTEM OF THREE LIQUID-CRYSTAL MIXTURES AND THEIR USE | [2012/49] | French: | MÉLANGE DE COMPOSÉS DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, SYSTÈME DE TROIS MÉLANGES DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3907768 (VAN DER VEEN JAN, et al) [A] 1* claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0034298 (FRASCHINI MARIO) [A] 1-11 * tables 1,2 * * claim - *; | [A]US4301023 (SCHUBERTH WINFRIED, et al) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2; claim 1; table - *; | [A]EP0087082 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]US4441508 (BUIRLEY WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6047093 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5508068 (NAKANO SEISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * columns 8-16; compound - * * examples 2,3 * * claim - * | by applicant | US3847139 | GB2060879 | EP0059328 | PL124264B |