EP2559128 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING EXCEEDING ENERGY OF AN ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/08] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING AN EXCESS AMOUNT OF ENERGY OF AN ELECTRIC ENERGY STORE OF A VEHICLE | ||
[2019/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCKECK, Ralf Schleitweg 21 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [2013/08] | Application number, filing date | 11709438.3 | 23.03.2011 | [2020/10] | WO2011EP54421 | Priority number, date | DE20101027793 | 15.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010027793 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141214 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559128 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2559128 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J3/32, B60K1/00, B60L58/12, B60L55/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H02J3/008 (EP,US);
B60L55/00 (EP);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
H02J3/003 (EP,US);
H02J3/322 (EP,US);
B60L2250/14 (EP);
B60L2260/54 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S10/126 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | H02J3/00, H02J3/32, B60L11/18, B60K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERMITTELN EINER ÜBERSCHÜSSIGEN ENERGIEMENGE EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2013/08] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING EXCEEDING ENERGY OF AN ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE IN A VEHICLE | [2019/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉNERGIE SUPERFLUE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2019/37] |
Former [2013/08] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING AN EXCESS AMOUNT OF ENERGY OF AN ELECTRIC ENERGY STORE OF A VEHICLE | ||
Former [2013/08] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DÉTERMINATION D'UNE QUANTITÉ D'ÉNERGIE EN EXCÈS D'UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | AT | 23.03.2020 | IE | 23.03.2020 | LU | 23.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GB | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 23.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 23.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 23.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 23.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005127855 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2008039989 (POLLACK SETH B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 35 - page 8, paragraph 114 *; | [A]US2009210357 (PUDAR NIKOLA J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 9, paragraph 73 *; | [XI]US2009229900 (HAFNER JAMES LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 6, paragraph 58 * [I] 4,5,7,8 |