EP2539811 - SOFTWARE APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 07.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sita Information Networking Computing Ireland Limited Building One Letterkenny Office Park Windyhall Letterkenny Ireland Co. Donegal / IE | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINDLAY, Denise 1 London Gate Blyth Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1BW / GB | 02 /
ATTAR, Michael Joseph 55 Orville Drive Bohemia Long Island Islip, New York / US | 03 /
EULER, Eric William 55 Orville Drive Bohemia Long Island Islip, New York / US | 04 /
SERRATORE, Cory Allan 777 Walkers Line Burlington Ontario, Toronto L7N 2G1 / CA | 05 /
ELIAS, Lissy 3100 Cumberland Boulevard Atlanta Georgia 30339 / US | 06 /
VALENTE, Leonardo Granado 55 Orville Drive Bohemia Long Island Islip, New York / US | 07 /
LESTYAN, Gabor Janos 777 Walkers Line Burlington Ontario, Toronto L7N 2G1 / CA | 08 /
FLENLEY, John Martin 1 London Gate Blyth Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1BW / GB | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11709892.1 | 25.02.2011 | WO2011EP52855 | Priority number, date | GB20100009606 | 08.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201009606 | US20100308208P | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 308208 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011104367 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539811 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
G06F8/34 (EP,RU,US);
G06F9/44 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON SOFTWAREAPPLIKATIONEN | [2013/01] | English: | SOFTWARE APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT TOOL | [2013/01] | French: | OUTIL DE DÉVELOPPEMENT D'APPLICATION LOGICIELLE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/50] | 04.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2014 | 04.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007011334 (HIGGINS STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-41 * paragraphs [0104] - [0118] * * paragraphs [0164] - [0172] * * figures 2,15 *; | [X]EP1069501 (MILANO POLITECNICO [IT]) [X] 1-41 * paragraphs [0052] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0164] - [0172] * * figure 25 *; | [X]US2001044738 (ELKIN ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1-41 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0161] - [0183] * * figures 14-17 * | [X] - DUNKEL J, BRUNS R, Model-Driven Architecture for Mobile Applications, BUSINESS INFORMATION SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 464 - 477, (20070425), ISBN 978-3-540-72034-8, XP019079208 [X] 1-41 * sections 2 to 3.2 at pages 465-474 * |