EP2550687 - CONJUGATED POLYMERS AND DEVICES INCORPORATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyera Corporation 8045 Lamon Avenue Suite 140 Skokie, IL 60077 / US | For all designated states Northwestern University Rebecca Crown Center 2-223 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Polyera Corporation 8045 Lamon Avenue Suite 140 Skokie, IL 60077 / US | ||
For all designated states Northwestern University Rebecca Crown Center 2-223 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FACCHETTI, Antonio 5412 N. Glenwood Ave. Chicago, IL 60640 / US | 02 /
MARKS, Tobin, J. 2300 Central Park Avenue Evanston, IL 60201 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Hui Apt. F2 1518 Central Street Evanston, IL 60201 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Zhihua 5155 Madison Street Unit 502 Skokie, IL 60077 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Lawrie, Donald James Lawrie IP Limited 310 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Lawrie, Donald James Lawrie IP Limited 272 Bath Street Glasgow, G2 4JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11710098.2 | 15.03.2011 | WO2011US28523 | Priority number, date | US20100317607P | 25.03.2010 Original published format: US 317607 P | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119374 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550687 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
C09B69/102 (EP,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
C09B69/105 (EP,US);
C09B69/109 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K10/484 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTE POLYMERE UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAMIT | [2013/05] | English: | CONJUGATED POLYMERS AND DEVICES INCORPORATING SAME | [2013/05] | French: | POLYMÈRES CONJUGUÉS ET DISPOSITIFS QUI INCORPORENT LESDITS POLYMÈRES CONJUGUÉS | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 17.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5162473 (JEN KWAN-YUE A [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 2, line 61 - column 7, line 59 * * column 20, line 46 - line 53 *; | [X]DE102008044868 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-10,14-24,26-30 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0031] , [0043] - [0062] - [0083] - [0089] *; | [A] - BOGYU LIM ET AL, "A New Poly(thienylenevinylene) Derivative with High Mobility and Oxidative Stability for Organic Thin-Film Transistors and Solar Cells", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20090720), vol. 21, no. 27, doi:10.1002/adma.200803700, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 2808 - 2814, XP055000235 [A] 1-30 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200803700 | [A] - YOUJUN HE ET AL, "Poly(3,6-dihexyl-thieno[3,2-b]thiophene vinylene): Synthesis, Field-Effect Transistors, and Photovoltaic Properties", MACROMOLECULES, (20081223), vol. 41, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ma801923c, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 9760 - 9766, XP055000229 [A] 1-30 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma801923c | Examination | - FU, YUEPING; ELSENBAUMER, RONALD L., "Structure/property relationships in conjugated polymers: Oxidation potentials, reduction potentials, and band gaps for a series of regiospecifically methoxy substituted thiophenevinylenes and poly(bithiophenevinylenes)", POLYMERIC MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, (19951231), vol. 72, doi:XP008184268, ISSN 0743-0515, pages 315 - 316 | - CICOIRA F ET AL, "ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS: ADVANCES AND PERSPECTIVES", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (20071123), vol. 17, no. 17, doi:10.1002/ADFM.200700174, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 3421 - 3434, XP001509437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.200700174 | by applicant | - Lange's Handbook of Chemistry, MCGRAW HILL, (1979), pages 3 - 138 | - YOON, M-H. ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, no. 13, pages 4678 - 4682 | - GUO, WATSON, ORG. LETT., (2008), vol. 10, pages 5333 - 5336 | US20050315076 | US20060816952 | US20060861308 | US20060642504 |