EP2545219 - Concrete element with an underside plastic sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/03] | CONCRETE SLEEPER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2014/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RST-Rail Systems and Technologies GmbH Bessemerstrasse 42b 12103 Berlin / DE | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÄRLICH, Hermann Domblick 5 39175 Gerwisch / DE | 02 /
ACHLER, Rainer Ernst-Günter Kirchhöfer Grund 60 34212 Melsungen-Kirchhof / DE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11710720.1 | 11.03.2011 | WO2011EP53709 | Priority number, date | EP20100156347 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10156347 | EP20100156352 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10156352 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110669 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545219 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2545219 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E01B3/46, E01B1/00, E01B9/68 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
E01B1/005 (EP,US);
E01B3/46 (EP,US);
E01B9/68 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Betonteil mit einer unterseitigen Kunststoffplatte | [2014/45] | English: | Concrete element with an underside plastic sole | [2014/45] | French: | Élément en béton doté d'une semelle en plastique | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/03] | BETONSCHWELLE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2013/03] | CONCRETE SLEEPER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2013/03] | TRAVERSE EN BÉTON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 25.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | IS | 05.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2017/38] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | IS | 05.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP1445378 (RST RAIL SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOG [DE]) [X] 6,7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0016]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1,3 [I] 4,5; | [XDAI]EP1298252 (RST RAIL SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOG [DE]) [XD] 6,7 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1,3 [I] 4,5; | [XA]WO2009108972 (GETZNER WERKSTOFFE HOLDING GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 6 * figure 3; claim 11 * [A] 1,3-5,7; | [A]FR2935399 (SATEBA SYSTEME VAGNEUX [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6* figures 5,6; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1298252 |