EP2545639 - DIGITAL DEVICE WITH BOOT STRAP CIRCUIT STIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microchip Technology Incorporated 2355 West Chandler Boulevard Chandler, Arizona 85224-6199 / US | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIS, Bryan 15426 East Via Del Palo Gilbert AZ 85298 / US | 02 /
KHARE, Sagar 1611 West Cindy Street Chandler AZ 85224 / US | 03 /
KAMIL, Mohammad House No. 30 2nd Cross 7th A Main Road Btm Layout 1st Stage Bangalore 560029 / IN | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | sgb europe Bergstrasse 31 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Grubert, Andreas King & Spalding 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11710941.3 | 10.03.2011 | WO2011US27920 | Priority number, date | US20100722602 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 722602 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011112821 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2545639 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M1/36 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
H02M1/36 (EP,KR,US);
H02M3/33515 (EP,KR,US);
H02M1/0012 (KR);
H03K4/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | DIGITALE VORRICHTUNG MIT BOOTSTRAP-SCHALTUNGSSTIMULATOR | [2013/03] | English: | DIGITAL DEVICE WITH BOOT STRAP CIRCUIT STIMULATOR | [2013/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF NUMÉRIQUE À STIMULATEUR DE CIRCUIT AUTOÉLÉVATEUR | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5459652 (FAULK RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-21* column 6, paragraph 5 - column 8, paragraph 1; figure 3; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5767631 (KONOPKA JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-5 *; | [XA]US2009231886 (XIA CHUN-HUA [CN], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 * [A] 2-10,12-21 | by applicant | US2009231886 |