EP2552831 - SCR method using Ce-Zr-REOx as host matrix for redox active cations as low temperature, hydrothermally durable and poison resistant catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/06] | ZROX, CE-ZROX, CE-ZR-REOX AS HOST MATRICES FOR REDOX ACTIVE CATIONS FOR LOW TEMPERATURE, HYDROTHERMALLY DURABLE AND POISON RESISTANT SCR CATALYSTS | ||
[2018/52] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUTHWARD, Barry, W., L. 20214 East Admiral Place Apartment 738 Catoosa, OK 74015 / US | 02 /
NUNAN, John, G. 8729 South 68th East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74133 / US | [2013/06] | Application number, filing date | 11711034.6 | 19.03.2011 | WO2011EP01354 | Priority number, date | US20100732819 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: US 732819 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011116907 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2552831 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/83, B01J23/30, B01J23/20 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
B01J21/066 (EP,US);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/10 (EP,US);
B01J23/20 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
B01J23/83 (EP,US);
B01J29/06 (EP,US);
B01J29/061 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01J29/7015 (EP,US);
B01J29/7215 (EP,US);
B01J29/723 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (EP,US);
B01D2251/206 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/407 (EP,US);
B01D2255/502 (EP,US);
B01D2255/504 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/23, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/3725, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/3725, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/56, B01J2523/842 (US,EP)
(-) |
Former IPC [2013/06] | C01B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | SCR-Methode in Gegenwart von CE-ZR-REOX ALS MATRIX FÜR REDOXaktive KATIONEN ALS NIEDRIGTEMPERATUR-SCR-Katalysatoren, die HYDROTHERMALE STABILITÄT UND VERGIFTUNGRESISTENz aufweisen | [2018/52] | English: | SCR method using Ce-Zr-REOx as host matrix for redox active cations as low temperature, hydrothermally durable and poison resistant catalysts | [2018/52] | French: | RÉDUCTION SÉLECTIVE catalytique au moyen de MATRICES de type CE-ZR-REOX POUR HÔTER DES CATIONS À ACTIVITÉ REDOX en tant que CATALYSEURS DE RÉDUCTION SÉLECTIVE À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE, À DURABILITÉ HYDROTHERMIQUE SATISFAISANTE ET RÉSISTANTS À L'EMPOISONNEMENT | [2018/52] |
Former [2013/06] | ZROX, CE-ZROX, CE-ZR-REOX ALS HOST-MATRIZEN FÜR REDOXAKTIVE KATIONEN FÜR HYDROTHERMISCH BESTÄNDIGE UND GIFTRESISTENTE SCR-NIEDRIGTEMPERATURKATALYSATOREN | ||
Former [2013/06] | ZROX, CE-ZROX, CE-ZR-REOX AS HOST MATRICES FOR REDOX ACTIVE CATIONS FOR LOW TEMPERATURE, HYDROTHERMALLY DURABLE AND POISON RESISTANT SCR CATALYSTS | ||
Former [2013/06] | ZROX, CE-ZROX, CE-ZR-REOX AU TITRE DE MATRICES POUR HÔTER DES CATIONS À ACTIVITÉ REDOX POUR CATALYSEURS DE RÉDUCTION SÉLECTIVE À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE, À DURABILITÉ HYDROTHERMIQUE SATISFAISANTE ET RÉSISTANTS À L'EMPOISONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US6387338 (ANATOLY BORTUN I [US], et al); | [XDI]US6468941 (BORTUN ANATOLY I [US], et al); | [XDI]US6585944 (NUNAN JOHN GERARD [US], et al); | [X]WO03053852 (RHODIA JAPAN LTD [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2008046920 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR], et al); | [XI]WO2008051752 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2008085265 (CATALYTIC SOLUTIONS INC [US]); | [A]WO2009118188 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2010002486 (UMICORE AG & CO KG, et al) | by applicant | JPS5169476 | JPS5242464 | GB1473883 | US4085193 | US4916107 | US4929586 | US4961917 | US5417949 | US5552128 | US5589147 | US5827489 | US6387338 | US6468941 | US6475944 | US6569394 | US6585944 | US6605264 | WO03082740 | WO03082741 | JP2003326167 | US6843971 | US2005069477 | US7005116 | US7049261 | US7118722 | EP1736232 | US7182927 | WO2008046920 | WO2008046921 | US2008095682 | WO2008085265 | WO2008106519 | WO2008118434 | US7431895 | WO2008150462 | WO2009001131 | US7498010 | US20080240170 | US20090363329 | US20090363310 | US20090408411 |