EP2553359 - CONVEYOR RAIL SUPPORT, CRYOGENIC FREEZER, AND METHOD OF COOLING FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE Société Anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Clau 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE Société Anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l' Exploitation des Procédés Georges C 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILGER, Stephen 10055 Olympia Drive Houston, Texas 77042 / US | 02 /
BRAITHWAITE, David C. 7302 Cart Gate Drive Houston, Texas 77095 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11712406.5 | 23.03.2011 | WO2011US29518 | Priority number, date | US20100752114 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: US 752114 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011123296 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553359 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/11 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
F25D25/04 (EP,US);
A23L3/375 (US);
A23L3/361 (US);
F25D3/11 (EP,US);
B65G21/02 (US);
B65G21/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | FÖRDERSCHIENENHALTERUNG, KRYOGENES GEFRIERGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN VON LEBENSMITTELN | [2013/06] | English: | CONVEYOR RAIL SUPPORT, CRYOGENIC FREEZER, AND METHOD OF COOLING FOOD | [2013/06] | French: | SUPPORT DE RAIL DE GUIDAGE DE CONVOYEUR, CONGÉLATEUR CRYOGÉNIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE REFROIDIR LES ALIMENTS | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB914026 (EDIBRAC LTD) [A] 1-6* figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0249323 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 14,15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1149779 (KRAUSE JOHANN A MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 1-15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005029078 (FORMIGONI JONATHAN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2673802 (ARROWHEAD CONVEYOR CORP INC [US]) [A] 7,8 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US3455120 |