EP2542528 - HETEROCYCLIC AMIDES AS ROCK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amakem NV Life Sciences Incubator Agoralaan A bis 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEYSEN, Dirk Life Sciences Incubator Agoralaan A bis B-3550 Diepenbeek / BE | 02 /
DEFERT, Olivier Life Sciences Incubator Agoralaan A bis B-3590 Diepenbeek / BE | 03 /
KAVAL, Nadzeya Life Sciences Incubator Agoralaan A bis B-3590 Diepenbeek / BE | 04 /
BLOM, Petra Damvalleistraat 49 B-9070 Destelbergen / BE | 05 /
BOLAND, Sandro Rue de Huy 2D B-4210 Burdinne / BE | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Laenen, Bart Roger Albert LC Services bvba Crutzenstraat 26 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2013/02] | Application number, filing date | 11712789.4 | 04.03.2011 | WO2011EP53343 | Priority number, date | GB20100018996 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: GB 201018996 | GB20100003395 | 02.03.2010 Original published format: GB 201003395 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011107608 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542528 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2542528 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/75, C07D239/42, C07D471/04, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D493/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/4409, A61K31/4433, A61K31/443, A61K31/4436, A61K31/505, A61P1/00, A61P9/00 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4409 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE AMIDE ALS ROCK-HEMMER | [2013/02] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC AMIDES AS ROCK INHIBITORS | [2013/02] | French: | AMIDES HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE ROCK | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 03.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13165882.5 / EP2626348 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MK | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | RS | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | SM | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | LU | 04.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MK | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RS | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2007042321 (DEVGEN NV [BE], et al) [ID] 1-31 * claims 1-28 *; | [A]WO2007006547 (DEVGEN NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-39 * | by applicant | WO2007042321 | US6372778 | US6369086 | US6369087 | US6372733 | EP0721331 | US4997834 | EP0370498 | - CAHN; INGOLD, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1966), vol. 5, pages 385 - 415 | - B. NEISES; W. STEGLICH, "Esterification of carboxylic acids with dicyclohexyl carbodiimide/4-dimethylaminopyridine", COLL., vol. 7, page 93 |