EP2545503 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A CHIP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BY COILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smartflex Innovation Pte. Ltd. 27 Ubi Road 4, No. 04-0'4 Singapore 408618 / SG | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORMEROD, Simon 813 Avenue des Grainières F-13600 La Ciotat / FR | 02 /
SALVAGIONE, Alain Le Grand Prè 275 chemin de Sequi F-13112 La Destrousse / FR | 03 /
ELBAZ, Didier Résidence Saint Loup 103 Boulevard de Saint Loup Tour A F-13010 Marseille / FR | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11712974.2 | 07.03.2011 | WO2011FR50467 | Priority number, date | FR20100000926 | 08.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1000926 | [2013/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110781 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545503 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2545503 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/077, H01L23/498 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G06K19/072 (EP);
G06K19/07718 (EP);
G06K19/07732 (EP);
G06K19/07743 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP);
G06K19/07779 (EP);
G06K19/07783 (EP);
H01L23/49855 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | G06K19/077, H01L23/498 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM CHIP UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN MITTELS SPULEN | [2013/03] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A CHIP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BY COILS | [2013/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À PUCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION PAR BOBINES | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2011 | AL | 18.12.2013 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | RS | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | IE | 07.03.2014 | LU | 07.03.2014 | NO | 18.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MK | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008205012 (HEINEMANN ERIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0039] - [0056] , [0003] * * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0055] * [I] 2,4-6,9,11,13-38; | [XI]WO0065689 (AMERASIA INT TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * figures 1-3B * * page 3, line 22 - page 9, line 27 * [I] 2-12; | [I]EP0307773 (EM MICROELECTRONIC MARIN SA [CH]) [I] 1-38 * figures 1-8 * * column 5, line 9 - column 10, line 31 *; | [I]US2003226901 (KIM DEOK-HEUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 3A-3L,4,5 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0054] * |