EP2528508 - DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND DRIVING A ROTATABLE PART OF A GANTRY OF A COMPUTER TOMOGRAPHY UNIT AND COMPUTER TOMOGRAPHY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALENYAK, Johann Giechburgblick 5 96110 Schesslitz / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Hans-Jürgen Leimengarten 14 91362 Pretzfeld / DE | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/49] | Wolff, Harry Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11713205.0 | 22.03.2011 | [2016/18] | WO2011EP54334 | Priority number, date | DE20101015061 | 15.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015061 | [2012/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011128187 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528508 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2528508 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2528508 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B6/03, F16C32/04, F16C39/06, H02K7/09 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
F16C32/0493 (EP,US);
A61B6/035 (EP,US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,US);
A61B6/56 (EP,US);
H02K7/09 (EP,US);
F16C2300/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGERUNG UND ZUM ANTRIEB EINES ROTIERBAREN TEILS EINER GANTRY EINES COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIEGERÄTES UND COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIEGERÄT | [2012/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND DRIVING A ROTATABLE PART OF A GANTRY OF A COMPUTER TOMOGRAPHY UNIT AND COMPUTER TOMOGRAPHY UNIT | [2012/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SOUTENIR ET POUR ENTRAÎNER UNE PARTIE ROTATIVE D'UN PORTIQUE MOBILE D'UN TOMODENSITOMÈTRE ET TOMODENSITOMÈTRE | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 11.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2011 | AL | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | MT | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4723259 (AMOR WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1,3,17 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]EP0549912 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB]) [A] 8 * abstract * * page 8, line 31 - page 8, line 41 *; | [A]EP0657915 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 16 * abstract ** column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 23 *; | [X]EP0676911 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9,15,17 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 43 *; | [X]US5548629 (KIMURA YUTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 9 * * column 12, line 53 - column 13, line 16 *; | [A]US2005116558 (YOKOYAMA AKIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X]WO2005102171 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,17 * abstract * * figures 1,2A,2B * * page 4, line 15 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 7 *; | [XI]WO2010026523 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14,17 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5-8 * * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 29 * * page 9, line 21 - page 9, line 25 * [I] 7,8,16 |