EP2542327 - METHOD FOR CLEANING FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/02] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING FILTERS | ||
[2016/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIPP, Jens-Werner Klashofsiedlung 3 33659 Bielefeld / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states KIPP, Jens-Werner Klashofsiedlung 3 33659 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Wickord, Wiro Wickord Buser Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rathenaustraße 96 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Wickord, Wiro Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Technologiepark 11 33100 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [2014/18] | Wickord, Wiro Patentanwaltskanzlei Wickord Technologiepark 11 33100 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [2013/02] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11713236.5 | 01.04.2011 | [2016/41] | WO2011EP55110 | Priority number, date | DE20101060716 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010060716 | DE20101048280 | 14.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010048280 | DE20101044929 | 10.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010044929 | DE20101036928 | 10.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010036928 | DE20101017834 | 22.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010017834 | DE20101013800 | 03.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010013800 | [2013/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011121114 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2542327 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2542327 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D41/04, B01D46/42, B01D46/24, B01D46/00, F01N3/022 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
B01D41/04 (EP,US);
B01D46/0091 (EP,US);
B01D46/2418 (EP,US);
B01D46/42 (EP,US);
B01D46/682 (EP,US);
B01D46/715 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | B01D46/42, B01D46/24, B01D46/00, F01N3/022 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN VON FILTERN | [2016/27] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING FILTERS | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR NETTOYER DES FILTRES | [2016/27] |
Former [2013/02] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON FILTERN | ||
Former [2013/02] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING FILTERS | ||
Former [2013/02] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER DES FILTRES | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2011 | AL | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | MT | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | AT | 01.04.2017 | IE | 01.04.2017 | LU | 01.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
AT | 01.04.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
AT | 01.04.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.04.2011 | |
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
AT | 01.04.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
AT | 01.04.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
AT | 01.04.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 01.04.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 12.10.2016 | |
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004103788 (STREICHSBIER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]DE102006047742 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2008054262 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) | Examination | DE19632970 | EP1501655 | by applicant | WO2005005377 | EP1501655 | EP1765551 |