EP2563540 - HACKSAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSER, Jochen Schwieberdinger Str. 79 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
KAISER, Hans Grüssiweg 1 CH-3297 Leuzigen / CH | 03 /
DI NICOLANTONIO, Aldo Im Winkel CH-4565 Recherswil / CH | 04 /
DELFINI, Stefano Grenchenstrasse 34 CH-2544 Bettlach / CH | 05 /
FISCHER, Martin Heinrich-Laengerer-Str. 89 71229 Leonberg / DE | 06 /
GRABSCH, Hans-Peter Florian-Geyer-Str. 25/1 71034 Boeblingen / DE | 07 /
HOFFMANN, Ulli Muehlweg 7 75223 Niefern-Oeschelbronn / DE | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 11713297.7 | 11.04.2011 | WO2011EP55608 | Priority number, date | DE20101028233 | 27.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010028233 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134775 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563540 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23D51/16 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B23D51/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | HUBSÄGE | [2013/10] | English: | HACKSAW | [2013/10] | French: | SCIE À MOUVEMENT ALTERNATIF | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0015423 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 3; figure - *; | [XA]JPH03117513 (SEIKOSHA KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-11; | [A]EP1312444 (TAKESHO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004020134 (ATLAS COPCO ELECTRIC TOOLS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 20; figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE102007030246 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0011] *; | [X]DE102008041682 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035]; figure -; claims 7,9 * |