EP2553904 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURING DATA IN MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Security First Corp. 29811 Santa Margarita Parkway Suite 600 Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | [2013/07] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Orsini, Rick L. 2100 Kings Forest Lane Flower Mound, Texas 75028 / US | ||
For all designated states O'Hare, Mark S. 8 Kennedy Court Coto De Caza, California 92679 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARE, Mark, S. 8 Kennedy Court, Cote De Caza CA 92679 / US | 02 /
ORSINI, Rick, L. 2100 Kings Forest Lane, Flower Mound TX 75028 / US | [2015/25] |
Former [2013/07] | 01 /
Orsini, Rick L. 2100 Kings Forest Lane, Flower Mound TX 75028 / US | ||
02 /
O'Hare, Mark S. 8 Kennedy Court, Cote De Caza CA 92679 / US | |||
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Shipp, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11713441.1 | 31.03.2011 | WO2011US30801 | Priority number, date | US20100319658P | 31.03.2010 Original published format: US 319658 P | US20100320242P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 320242 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011123692 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553904 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F21/00, H04L9/08, G06F17/30, G06F11/10, G06F11/20 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
G06F11/1076 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (US);
G06F21/60 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F21/6227 (EP,US);
G06F21/72 (US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
H04L9/085 (EP,US);
H04L9/0894 (EP,US);
G06F11/182 (EP,US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2107 (US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG VON DATEN IN BEWEGUNG | [2013/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURING DATA IN MOTION | [2013/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SÉCURISATION DE DONNÉES EN MOUVEMENT | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5485474 (RABIN MICHAEL O [US]) [Y] 44-54 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004267832 (WONG THOMAS K [US], et al) [Y] 44-54* paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *; | [I]US2008147821 (DIETRICH BRADLEY W [US], et al) [I] 6-13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraphs [0139] - [0144] *; | [Y]US2008183975 (FOSTER LYNN [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0041] * * the whole document *; | [I]US2009177894 (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [I] 32-43 * figure 36 * * the whole document * * paragraph [0434] *; | [Y]US2009254572 (REDLICH RON M [US], et al) [Y] 23-31 * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [3155] - paragraph [3160] * * figures D-10 *; | [X] - RABIN M O, "EFFICIENT DISPERSAL OF INFORMATION FOR SECURITY, LOAD BALANCING, AND FAULT TOLERANCE", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890401), vol. 36, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1145/62044.62050, ISSN 0004-5411, pages 335 - 348, XP000570108 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/62044.62050 | [XY] - HUGO KRAWCZYK, "Secret Sharing Made Short", INTERNET CITATION, (1998), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://www.cs.cornell.edu/courses/cs754/2001fa/secretshort.pdf, (20081124), XP002505270 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4 | [A] - SHAMIR ET AL, "HOW TO SHARE A SECRET", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20070330), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013119902 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - GANGER G R ET AL, "Survivable storage systems", DARPA INFORMATION SURVIVABILITY CONFERENCE & EXPOSITION II, 2001. DISC EX '01. PROCEEDINGS 12-14 JUNE 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010612), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7695-1212-9, pages 184 - 195, XP010548746 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [XI] - Gregory R Ganger ET AL, "PASIS: A Distributed Framework for Perpetually Available and Secure Information Systems, Final technical rept. Jun 1999-Dec 2003", (20050701), pages 1 - 203, URL: http://www.dtic.mil/cgi-bin/GetTRDoc?AD=ADA436245&Location=U2&doc=GetTRDoc.pdf, (20111107), XP055011444 [X] 14-16 * page 1 - page 18 * * paragraph [0003] * [I] 17-22 | [Y] - EASTER R J ET AL, "S/390 parallel enterprise server CMOS cryptographic coprocessor", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990101), vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 0018-8646, pages 761 - 776, XP002335589 [Y] 23-31 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7391865 | US19580613196 | US19420613202 | US19670116026 | US19550119833 | US19750119995 | US19650121483 | US20030122097 | US19970123498 | US19760127832 | US19770129538 | US19640612644 | US19600613495 | US19870613731 | US19500613749 | US19830613845 | US20000558634 | US19970926277 | US19990435011 | US20000477943 | US20050258839 |