EP2548405 - MANAGING RACE CONDITIONS BETWEEN CIRCUIT SWITCHED FALLBACK REQUESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOOHER, Patrick, J. 1200 Pauline-julien Unit 35 Montreal QC H2J 0A2 / CA | 02 /
WATFA, Mahmoud 7162 De Pontoise Saint Leonard QC H1S 2B3 / CA | 03 /
BEHROUZ, Aghili 32 Bethal Lane Commack NY 11747 / US | 04 /
OLVERA-HERNANDEZ, Ulises 2 Rolland Laniel Kirkland QC H9J 4A5 / CA | 05 /
ADJAKPLE, Pascal, M. 67 Red Brook Road Great Neck NY 11024 / US | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Hansson, Anders Max Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2013/04] | Application number, filing date | 11713570.7 | 26.03.2011 | WO2011US30114 | Priority number, date | US20100408996P | 01.11.2010 Original published format: US 408996 P | US20100318070P | 26.03.2010 Original published format: US 318070 P | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120030 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2548405 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04W76/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (KR);
H04W36/00224 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W68/12 (KR);
H04W36/14 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER WETTLAUFSITUATION ZWISCHEN LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN FALLBACK-ANFORDERUNGEN | [2013/04] | English: | MANAGING RACE CONDITIONS BETWEEN CIRCUIT SWITCHED FALLBACK REQUESTS | [2013/04] | French: | GESTION DE CONDITIONS DE COURSE ENTRE DES DEMANDES DE REDÉMARRAGE À COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 17.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP12188708.7 / EP2552171 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010019364 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | by applicant | US19700613180 | US19960614089 |