EP2569082 - SLURRY LOOP POLYMERIZATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/12] | SLURRY LOOP POLYMERIZATION REACTOR AND PROCESS | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Sales (UK) Limited Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARISSAL, Daniel 33 Chemin des fontaines Casteau 7061 / BE | 02 /
LEE, Stephen, Kevin 17 Watery Lane Merton Park London SW20 9AA / GB | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | King, Alex, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11713811.5 | 12.04.2011 | [2020/14] | WO2011EP55685 | Priority number, date | EP20100162709 | 12.05.2010 Original published format: EP 10162709 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141250 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569082 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569082 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J4/00, B01J4/02, B01J19/00, B01J19/18, C08F10/00, C08F2/06, C08F2/01 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01J19/002 (EP,US);
B01J19/1837 (EP,US);
B01J4/02 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00186 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00247 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00254 (EP,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/01 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/08 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/12] | B01J4/02, B01J19/00, B01J19/18, B01J4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN IN EINEM SCHLAUFENREAKTOR | [2019/45] | English: | SLURRY LOOP POLYMERIZATION PROCESS | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION DANS UN RÉACTEUR EN BOUCLE | [2019/45] |
Former [2013/12] | SUSPENSIONSSCHLAUFENPOLYMERISATIONSREAKTOR UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2013/12] | SLURRY LOOP POLYMERIZATION REACTOR AND PROCESS | ||
Former [2013/12] | RÉACTEUR EN BOUCLE POUR POLYMÉRISATION EN SUSPENSION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2019 | 08.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20161780.0 / EP3682966 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2011 | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | IE | 12.04.2020 | LU | 12.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | FR | 01.06.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GB | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.04.2011 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GB | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GB | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GB | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GB | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US3694423 (SMITH WAYNE E, et al) [XD] 1-17 * column 1, lines 16-44 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 37 * * column 4, lines 47-58 * * figures 1,2 *; | [I]US5948871 (GOODE MARK GREGORY [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * column 14, line 17 - column 15, line 37 *; | [X]US2002107342 (MAWSON SIMON [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0307] , [0315] , [0319] - [0323] - [0364] , [0369] - [0373] * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US2002132936 (KENDRICK JAMES AUSTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0045] , [0016] , [0065] - [0071] * * figures 1,3,5,7 * [A] 8-17; | [I]US2003114608 (THARAPPEL RONALD [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * figures 3,3A,3B,4 * * paragraphs [0040] , [ 0063] - [0066] *; | [A]US2007037935 (KARER RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0047] - [0049] - [0053] , [0056] ** figures 4-8 *; | [XA]US2008038158 (MOERS MARC [BE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0060] - [0065] - [0067] , [0072] * * figures 1,7-10 * [A] 8-17; | [XA]US2008081006 (MYERS DANIEL N [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] - [0027] - [0029] , [0035] * * figures 1-6,8 * [A] 8-17 | Examination | WO03070365 | - Shinjiro Kodama ET AL, "Relation of Space Velocity and Space Time Yield", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry, US, (19530801), vol. 45, no. 8, doi:10.1021/ie50524a022, ISSN 0019-7866, pages 1644 - 1648, XP055327828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie50524a022 | by applicant | US3694423 | US4698211 | US6204344 | US6239235 | WO2004024780 | WO2004054700 | WO2005077522 | US7014821 | WO2008042182 |