EP2545036 - BIS AROMATIC COMPOUNDS FOR USE AS LTC4 SYNTHASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biolipox AB P O Box 303 751 05 Uppsala / SE | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Peter PO Box 303 S-751 05 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
PELCMAN, Benjamin PO Box 303 S-751 05 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
KATKEVICS, Martins Latvian Insitute of Organic Synthesis 21 Aizkraukles Str Riga LV 1006 / LV | 04 /
RÖNN, Robert PO Box 303 S-751 05 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
KROG-JENSEN, Christian PO Box 303 S-751 05 Uppsala / SE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/03] | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11713851.1 | 14.03.2011 | WO2011GB00358 | Priority number, date | WO2010GB00438 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: PCT/GB2010/000438 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110824 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545036 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/74, C07D405/10, C07D409/10, A61K31/44, A61P11/00, A61P29/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
C07D409/10 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D213/74 (EP);
C07D405/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE BIS-VERBINDUNGEN ALS LTC4-SYNTHASEHEMMER | [2013/03] | English: | BIS AROMATIC COMPOUNDS FOR USE AS LTC4 SYNTHASE INHIBITORS | [2013/03] | French: | COMPOSÉS BIS AROMATIQUES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LTC4 SYNTHASE | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 16.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2008107661 (BIOLIPOX AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-21 * page 1, line 5 - line 11; claim 1 *; | [ID]WO2009030887 (BIOLIPOX AB [SE], et al) [ID] 1-21 * page 1, line 6 - page 1, line 12; claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2010103278 (BIOLIPOX AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1-21 * claims 1-21; table 5; compounds 5.1-5.29 * | by applicant | WO2008107661 | WO2009030887 | WO2010103278 | WO2006077366 | US2005256102 | - H.-E CLAESSON, S.-E. DAHLéN, J. INTERNAL MED., (1999), vol. 245, page 205 | - ORGANIC AND BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 494 - 500 | - JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (2006), vol. 256, no. 1-2, pages 242 - 246 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2006), vol. 47, no. 34, pages 6063 - 6066 | - SYNTHESIS, (2006), vol. 21, pages 3547 - 3574 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2006), vol. 62, no. 50, pages 11675 - 11678 | - SYNTHESIS, (2006), vol. 15, pages 2618 - 2623 | - PHARMAZIE, (2006), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 505 - 510 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (2006), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 1405 - 1411 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2004), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 1023 - 1026 | - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2006), vol. 8, no. 26, pages 5987 - 5990 | - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 71, no. 9, pages 3551 - 3558 | - MOLANDER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, page 9198 | - TAKEMIYA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2006), vol. 128, page 14800 | - J. A. JOULE, K. MILLS, G. F. SMITH, Heterocyclic Chemistry, CHAPMAN & HALL | - Science of Synthesis, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (2006), vol. 9-17 | - MOL. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 41, pages 873 - 879 |