EP2553229 - SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION VIA ELECTROLYSIS OF UREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohio University 340 West State Street Unit 14 Athens, OH 45701-2979 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Ohio University 340 West State Street Unit 14 Athens, OH 45701-2979 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTE, Gerardine, G. 7519 Longmeadow Lane Athens, OH 45701 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11714464.2 | 31.03.2011 | WO2011US30694 | Priority number, date | US20100320447P | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 320447 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123620 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553229 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2553229 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, C25B1/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/00 (EP,US);
C25B1/27 (KR);
F01N2610/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE KATALYTISCHE REDUKTION MITTELS HARNSTOFFELEKTROLYSE | [2013/06] | English: | SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION VIA ELECTROLYSIS OF UREA | [2013/06] | French: | RÉDUCTION SÉLECTIVE CATALYTIQUE EFFECTUÉE AU MOYEN D'UNE ÉLECTROLYSE D'URÉE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | RS | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.03.2015 | LU | 31.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 17.12.2014 | |
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BG | 17.12.2014 | |
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004057887 (SUN WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1,11,19* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009095636 (BOTTE GERARDINE G [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2009095636 |