EP2560992 - BINDING DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE WILDT, Rudolf, Maria GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
LIDDAMENT, Mark Domantis Limited 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB | 03 /
RAMSAY, Nicola Domantis Limited 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB | 04 /
SCHON, Oliver Domantis Limited 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB | 05 /
STOOP, Adriaan, Allart Domantis Limited 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Furlong, Isla Jane, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Furlong, Isla Jane, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11714991.4 | 19.04.2011 | WO2011EP56220 | Priority number, date | US20100326258P | 21.04.2010 Original published format: US 326258 P | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011131659 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2560992 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/22, C07K16/24, C07K16/30 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
C07K16/247 (EP,US);
C07K16/3007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | BINDEDOMÄNEN | [2013/09] | English: | BINDING DOMAINS | [2013/09] | French: | DOMAINES DE LIAISON | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 28.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005118642 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,26,30,31,33-35 * the whole document * [I] 1-27,30-35; | [Y]WO2008096158 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-15,19-26,30-35* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010017595 (ARANA THERAPEUTICS LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-26,30-35 * the whole document *; | [Y] - SAERENS DIRK ET AL, "Single-domain antibodies as building blocks for novel therapeutics.", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY OCT 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18691671, (200810), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1471-4892, pages 600 - 608, XP002642572 [Y] 1-5,9-15,19-26,30-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.COPH.2008.07.006 | [A] - SODERLIND E ET AL, "Domain libraries: Synthetic diversity for de novo design of antibody V-regions", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950728), vol. 160, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/0378-1119(95)00200-P, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 269 - 272, XP004042157 [A] 1-26,30-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00200-P | [A] - JESPERS L ET AL, "Crystal Structure of HEL4, a Soluble, Refoldable Human VH Single Domain with a Germ-line Scaffold", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20040402), vol. 337, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.JMB.2004.02.013, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 893 - 903, XP004496018 [A] 1-26,30-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.02.013 | by applicant | WO9426087 | WO0029004 | US6485943 | WO03002609 | WO2004003019 | WO2004058821 | WO2004101790 | WO2005093074 | WO2005118642 | WO2006046042 | WO2006059106 | WO2007008515 | WO2008096158 | WO2009068649 | - HOLT ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 21, no. I, pages 484 - 490 | - ENEVER ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 20, pages 1 - 7 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., EMBO J, (1995), vol. 14, pages 1628 - 38 | - AMALGRO ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1998), vol. 47, pages 355 - 363 | - HOLT, "Anti-Serum albumin domain antibodies for extending the half-lives of short lived drugs", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN & SELECTION, (2008), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 283 - 288 | - CHOTHIA C, LESK AM, "Canonical structures for the hypervariable regions of immunoglobulins", J MOL BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(87)90412-8, pages 901 - 17, XP024010426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(87)90412-8 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., "Conformations of immunoglobulin hypervariable regions", NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, doi:doi:10.1038/342877a0, pages 877 - 883, XP002030586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/342877a0 | - URLAUB, G., CHASIN, LA., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, no. 7, pages 4216 - 4220 | - DAILEY, L. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 54, pages 739 - 749 | - PEAR, W. S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 8392 - 8396 | - LEBOWITZ ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 11, pages 2067 - 2079 | - PHILO ET AL., J.BIOL.CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 27840 - 27846 | - PHILO, J.S., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2000), vol. 321, pages 100 - 120 | - LAUE ET AL., Analytical ultracentrifugation in biochemistry and polymer science, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (1992), pages 90 - 125 | - BJ6RCK L., "Protein L. A novel bacterial cell wall protein with affinity for Ig L chains", J IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 140, no. 4, pages 1194 - 7 | - M. GRAILLE, E. STURA, N. HOUSDEN, J. BECKINGHAM, S. BOTTOMLEY, D. BEALE, M. TAUSSIG, B. SUTTON, M. GORE, J. CHARBONNIER, "Complex between Peptostreptococcus magnus Protein L and a Human Antibody Reveals Structural Convergence in the Interaction Modes of Fab Binding Proteins", STRUCTURE, (2001), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S0969-2126(01)00630-X, pages 679 - 687, XP055259618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(01)00630-X | - KASTERN W, SJOBRING U, BJORCK L., "Structure of peptostreptococcal protein L and identification of a repeated immunoglobulin light chain- binding domain", J BIOL CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 18, pages 12820 - 5, XP002318664 | - BATHELEMY ET AL., "Comprehensive analysis of the factors contributing to the stability and solubility of autonomous human VH domains", J BIOL CHEM, (2007), vol. 283, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M708536200, pages 3639 - 3654, XP055040419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M708536200 | - CHATELLIER ET AL., "Functional mapping of the conserved residues located at the VL and VH domain interface of a Fab", J MOL BIOL, (1996), vol. 246, page L-6 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., "Domain association in immunoglobulin molecules the packing of variable domains", J MOL BIOL, (1985), vol. 186, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(85)90137-8, pages 651 - 663, XP024011326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(85)90137-8 | - FAMM ET AL., "Thermodynamically stable aggregation resistant antibody domains through directed evolution", J MOL BIOL, (2008), vol. 376, pages 926 - 931 | - JESPERS ET AL., "Aggregation-resistant domain antibodies selected on phage by heat denaturation", NATURE BIOTECH, (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1000, pages 1161 - 1165, XP008154827 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1000 | - MATSUURA, PLIICKTHUN, "Selection based on the folding properties of proteins with ribosome display", FEBS, (2003), vol. 539, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(03)00178-9, pages 24 - 28, XP004415425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(03)00178-9 | - MATSUURA, PLIICKTHUN, "Strategies for selection from protein libraries composed of de novo designed secondary structure modules", ORIGINS OF LIFE AND EVOLUTION OF THE BIOSPHERE, (2004), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1023/B:ORIG.0000009836.86519.eb, pages 151 - 157, XP055006163 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:ORIG.0000009836.86519.eb | - RAFFEN ET AL., "Reengineering immunoglobulin domain interactions by introduction of charged residues", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1998), vol. 11, pages 303 - 309 | - SIEBER ET AL., "Selecting proteins with improved stability by a phage-based method", NATURE, (1998), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1098-955, pages 955 - 960, XP055275357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1098-955 | - STEVENS ET AL., "Self-association of the human immunoglobulin KI light chains: role of the third hypervariable region", PNAS, (1980), vol. 77, pages 1144 - 1148 | - VARGAS-MADRAZO, PAZ-GARCIA, "An improved model of association for VH-VL immunoglobulin domains: asymmetries between VH and VL in the packing of some of the interface residues", J MOL RECOG, (2003), vol. 16, pages 13 - 120 | WO2005GB03243 | WO2010EP52008 | WO2010EP52007 |