EP2560771 - ROLLING MILL FOR LONG ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Innse S.p.A. Via Milano 4 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIN, Paolo Via Buccella 55 I-27049 Vigevano (PV) / IT | 02 /
PACHER, Marcello Via Fratelli Cervi 30 I-20010 Bareggio (MI) / IT | 03 /
PAVESI, Claudio Via Italo Calvino 7 I-20063 Cernusco sul Naviglio (MI) / IT | 04 /
ZANELLA, Guido Emilio Via G. da Cermenate 28 I-20141 Milano / IT | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Belloni, Giancarlo, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11715750.3 | 23.03.2011 | WO2011IB51222 | Priority number, date | IT2010MI00672 | 20.04.2010 Original published format: IT MI20100672 | [2013/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011132094 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2560771 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2560771 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/10, B21B31/10, B21B35/04 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
B21B13/10 (EP,US);
B21B31/10 (EP,US);
B21B35/04 (EP,US);
B21B1/18 (EP,US);
B21B13/103 (EP,US);
B21B17/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALZWERK FÜR LANGE GEGENSTÄNDE | [2013/09] | English: | ROLLING MILL FOR LONG ARTICLES | [2013/09] | French: | LAMINOIR POUR ARTICLES LONGS | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 14.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14169505.6 / EP2772320 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio (Udine) / IT Opponent's representative Celona, Antonio Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio (Udine) / DE Opponent's representative Celona, Antonio Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | 15.05.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/15] | 04.03.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 18.01.2019 | Appeal received No. T0255/19 | 29.03.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.01.2019 | Appeal received No. T0255/19 | 26.03.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 16.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 20.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 09.07.2014 | AT | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MK | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SM | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | GB | 23.03.2015 | IE | 23.03.2015 | LU | 23.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | CZ | 23.03.2020 | HR | 23.03.2020 | PL | 23.03.2020 | RO | 23.03.2020 | RS | 23.03.2020 | SK | 23.03.2020 | ES | 24.03.2020 | SI | 24.03.2020 | FR | 31.03.2020 | GR | 08.10.2020 | IS | 29.12.2021 | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/10] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
HR | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
RS | 23.03.2020 | ||
SK | 23.03.2020 | ||
ES | 24.03.2020 | ||
SI | 24.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
GR | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
HR | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
RS | 23.03.2020 | ||
SK | 23.03.2020 | ||
ES | 24.03.2020 | ||
SI | 24.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
GR | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
HR | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
RS | 23.03.2020 | ||
SK | 23.03.2020 | ||
SI | 24.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
GR | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
RS | 23.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
RS | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2020 | ||
RO | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.07.2014 | ||
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2845052 (KOCKS GMBH FRIEDRICH) [A] 1-16 * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9719767 (INNOCENTI ENG SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-16* figures 1-8; claims 1-16 *; | [A]DE10015285 (KOCKS TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figures 2-4; claims 1-3 *; | [AD]WO2009141414 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [AD] 1-16 * figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * | by applicant | EP0565772 | EP0593709 | WO2009141414 |