EP2550665 - MIRROR AND EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gigaphoton Inc. 2-6-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMEDA, Hidenobu c/o Research Division Komatsu Ltd. 400 Yokokurashinden Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0819 / JP | 02 /
WAKABAYASHI, Osamu c/o Gigaphoton Inc. 25-1, Shinomiya 3-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8555 / JP | 03 /
MORIYA, Masato c/o Research Division Komatsu Ltd. 400 Yokokurashinden Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0819 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/05] | Hards, Andrew Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11716315.4 | 22.03.2011 | [2018/30] | WO2011JP57516 | Priority number, date | JP20100283717 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010283717 | JP20100070988 | 25.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010070988 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011118830 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550665 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550665 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, B82Y10/00, G02B5/08, G21K1/06 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
G21K1/062 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G02B5/0891 (EP,US);
G03F7/70891 (EP,US);
G03F7/70983 (EP,US);
G21K2201/067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | G21K1/06, G02B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIEGEL UND SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN VON EXTREM UV STRAHLUNG | [2018/13] | English: | MIRROR AND EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT GENERATION SYSTEM | [2013/05] | French: | MIROIR ET SYSTÈME POUR LA PRODUCTION DE RADIATION UV EXTRÊME | [2018/13] |
Former [2013/05] | SPIEGEL UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON EXTREMEM UV-LICHT | ||
Former [2013/05] | MIROIR ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE EXTRÊME | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 23.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2011 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | GB | 22.03.2019 | IE | 22.03.2019 | LU | 22.03.2019 | MT | 22.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005024848 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2006177740 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,4-8,14 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,9,10,12,13,20-22 [I] 15,16,18,19; | [Y]US2009159808 (BOWERING NORBERT R [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,20-22 * paragraph [0091]; figure 9A *; | [Y]US7641349 (CHROBAK CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al) [Y] 3,13 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 33 *; | [I]WO2010020337 (ASML HOLDING NV [NL], et al) [I] 1,7,9,11,17,20 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0082]; figures 4A,4B,5A,5B *; | [XY] - D A TICHENOR ET AL, "Recent results in the development of an integrated EUV laboratory tool", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (1995), vol. 2437, page 292-307, XP002656696 [X] 11,17 * paragraph [2. concept of EUV lithography tool]; figure 2 * [Y] 20-22 | [Y] - C MONTCALM ET AL, "Multilayer reflective coatings for extreme-ultraviolet lithography", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (1998), vol. 3331, pages 42 - 51, XP002656697 [Y] 9,10,20-22 * the whole document * | [IY] - DISCLOSED ANONYMOUSLY, "Increasing thermal conductivity of EUV reticles", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20080501), vol. 529, no. 33, ISSN 0374-4353, page 417, XP007138166 [I] 1,7,11,17 * the whole document * [Y] 2,12 | by applicant | JP2010070988 | JP2010283717 |