EP2553775 - FITTING CONFIRMATION CONSTRUCTION FOR CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHYAMA, Kouichi c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd 206-1, Nunonikibara Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11716317.0 | 25.03.2011 | WO2011JP58380 | Priority number, date | JP20100080953 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010080953 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011122688 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553775 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2553775 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627, H01R13/641, H01R12/79 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H01R12/79 (EP,US);
H01R13/6272 (EP,US);
H01R13/641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINPASSBESTÄTIGUNGSKONSTRUKTION FÜR STECKVERBINDER | [2013/06] | English: | FITTING CONFIRMATION CONSTRUCTION FOR CONNECTORS | [2013/06] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE CONFIRMATION D'AJUSTEMENT POUR LES CONNECTEURS | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 01.01.2014 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | RS | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | SM | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | IE | 25.03.2014 | LU | 25.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MK | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.03.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RS | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008009171 (TSUJI TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0054] , [0059] , [0067] , [0069] , [0071] * * figures 6-20 * [I] 4; | [A]US2004002255 (UEDA HIROHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0068] - [0121] * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]JPH11260456 (WHITAKER CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2006085989 | JP2003308924 | JPH05343133 | JP2004363044 | JP2010080953 |