EP2563196 - A LIQUID DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECKITT & COLMAN (OVERSEAS) HEALTH LIMITED 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SH1 3UH / GB | [2019/25] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Reckitt & Colman (Overseas) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIEPEN, Jacobus Simon Petrus Reckitt Benckiser Room C, 11/F, Tower C Peace Square Shenghe Road Nancheng Dongguan City, Guangdong 523009 / CN | 02 /
PADAIN, Christopher Leonard 16 Park Place Cottages Remenham Hill Remenham Henley on Thames RG9 3HW / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11716999.5 | 20.04.2011 | WO2011GB50781 | Priority number, date | GB20100007238 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007238 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135336 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563196 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A47K5/1217 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/122 (EP,KR,US);
B05B9/0426 (EP,KR,US);
B05B9/043 (EP,KR,US);
B05B9/0861 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABESYSTEM | [2013/10] | English: | A LIQUID DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2013/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 05.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2008185396 (YANG FRANK [US], et al) [I] 1,3-6 * page 3, paragraph 32 - paragraph 43 * * page 4, paragraphs 48, 56 * * page 5, paragraph 62 - paragraph 66; figures 1,2,3; claim 1 *; | [I]US2004226962 (MAZURSKY RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 1,3-6 * page 1, paragraph 22 - page 2, paragraph 29; figures 1-4 *; | [ADP]WO2010055314 (RECKITT & COLMAN OVERSEAS [GB], et al) [ADP] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB20080020981 |