EP2553144 - GAS INJECTION DEVICE WITH UNIFORM GAS VELOCITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koolerheadz 481 Chemin des Vignes 13109 Simiane Collongue / FR | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOLS, Jacques, Constant, Stefan 481 Chemin des Vignes F-13109 Simiane Collongue / FR | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | ||
Former [2013/06] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 11717025.8 | 25.03.2011 | [2016/47] | WO2011IB51273 | Priority number, date | FR20100001257 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1001257 | FR20100001255 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1001255 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011121507 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553144 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2553144 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, F15D1/08 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C23C16/45525 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (US);
B05D1/60 (US);
C23C16/18 (US);
C23C16/4481 (US);
C23C16/455 (US);
C23C16/45561 (US);
C23C16/45565 (US);
C23C16/45582 (EP,US);
C23C16/45591 (EP,US);
C30B25/14 (US);
F15D1/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | C23C16/455, B01J4/00, F15D1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASINJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINHEITLICHER GASGESCHWINDIKEIT | [2013/06] | English: | GAS INJECTION DEVICE WITH UNIFORM GAS VELOCITY | [2013/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE GAZ À VITESSE UNIFORME | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 23.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | GB | 25.03.2017 | IE | 25.03.2017 | LU | 25.03.2017 | MT | 25.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 25.03.2017 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2177939 (VSR ENG GMBH FOERDERTECH) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0030]; figure 3 *; | [X]DE4107634 (RAUTE OY [FI]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 43-54; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2661554 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR]) [A] 8,10,11* figure 1 *; | [X]GB2286856 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 12; figure 20 *; | [X]US2001032588 (HARAFUJI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * paragraph [0008]; figures 5a, 5b, 6a, 6b, 6c, 8a, 8b *; | [X]US6544869 (HARAFUJI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * column 1, lines 50-53; figures 8a, 8b, 9a, 9b * * column 2, lines 39-41 *; | [XD]US2003150560 (KINNARD DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0053] - [0054]; figure 19 * | by applicant | US7163587 | US7404984 |