EP2563711 - PUSH BUTTON DISPENSER FOR BOTTLES WITH CARBONATED BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYAMBI, Samuel O. 1847 Ebenezer Farm Circle Marietta, Georgia 30066 / US | 02 /
SEELHOFEL, Fritz Haldenstrasse 18 CH-8315 Lindau / CH | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11717559.6 | 26.04.2011 | [2015/45] | WO2011EP56522 | Priority number, date | CH20100062510 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: CH 625102010 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011134928 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563711 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563711 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B65D83/32 (EP,US);
B65D47/103 (US);
B65D83/44 (EP,US);
B67D1/0456 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKKNOPF-DISPENSER FÜR FLASCHEN MIT KARBONISIERTEN GETRÄNKEN | [2013/10] | English: | PUSH BUTTON DISPENSER FOR BOTTLES WITH CARBONATED BEVERAGES | [2013/10] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR À BOUTON-POUSSOIR POUR BOUTEILLES CONTENANT DES BOISSONS GAZÉIFIÉES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 01.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2011 | AL | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | AT | 26.04.2016 | GB | 26.04.2016 | IE | 26.04.2016 | LU | 26.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
AT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
AT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
AT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
AT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
AT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 26.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 26.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4154378 (MAURELLI MANLIO [FR], et al) [I] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 37 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [YA]EP0133770 (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 2-7 * page 1, lines 2, 3 * * page 2, line 5 - line 28 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 5 * * page 8, line 1 - line 2 * * page 8, line 22 - line 32 * * page 9, line 14 - line 29 * * page 10, line 13 - line 20 * * page 11, line 23 - line 26 * * page 14, line 27 - line 34 * * figures 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, * [A] 1; | [A]EP0583825 (BELGIUM SPRAY ACCESSORY FACTOR [BE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 21 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5520310 (BAUER DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 11 - line 19 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 22 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US2005252936 (FINLAY PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0086] * * figures 1, 7, 9, 10, * [Y] 2-7 | by applicant | US3976221 | GB2219988 | EP1737759 |