EP2558263 - APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PLASTICS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EREMA Engineering Recycling Maschinen und Anlagen Gesellschaft m.b.H. Freindorf Unterfeldstrasse 3 4052 Ansfelden / AT | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIGERSTORFER, Georg Waldbothenweg 88 A-4030 Linz/Ebelsberg / AT | 02 /
FEICHTINGER, Klaus Reindlstrasse 5 A-4040 Linz / AT | 03 /
HACKL, Manfred Bachlbergweg 128 A-4040 Linz-Urfahr / AT | 04 /
WENDELIN, Gerhard Waldbothenweg 82 A-4030 Linz / AT | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Andreas Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 A-1030 Wien / AT | [2013/08] | Application number, filing date | 11718234.5 | 13.04.2011 | WO2011AT00180 | Priority number, date | AT20100000600 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: AT 6002010 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011127508 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2558263 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2558263 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/04 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
B29B17/0412 (EP,US);
B29B17/04 (KR);
B01F27/80 (US);
B01F35/71775 (US);
B29B13/10 (US);
B29B7/42 (EP);
B29B7/60 (EP);
B29B7/885 (EP);
B29B9/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBEREITEN VON KUNSTSTOFFMATERIAL | [2013/08] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PLASTICS MATERIAL | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PRÉPARER UNE MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 04.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13189929.6 / EP2689908 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
IS | 22.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0236318 (OMNIPOL PROPRIETARY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-17* page 8, line 25 - line 27; figure 6 *; | [X]EP1273412 (MAGMA TRADE DI MAURO MAGNI & C [IT]) [X] 1-17 * column 3, line 53 - line 55; figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO2004108379 (BACHER HELMUT [AT], et al) [X] 1,16,17 * figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0123771 | WO8802684 |