EP2552542 - DEVICE FOR ACCESS TO AN ITEM OF ASSISTANCE AND EMERGENCY HARDWARE, AND A SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING SUCH DEVICES. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atialis 21 boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROSSON, Hubert 5 rue du Sergent Hoff F-75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
DUVERDIER, Hubert 64 rue Léon Barbier F-78400 Chatou / FR | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Pontet Allano & Associes Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint Aubin 91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/31] | Pontet Allano & Associes Parc Orsay Université 25, rue Jean-Rostand 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/06] | Akdogan, Nurhak, et al PONTET ALLANO ET ASSOCIES 6 avenue du Général de Gaulle 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 11718425.9 | 24.03.2011 | WO2011FR50630 | Priority number, date | FR20100052274 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1052274 | [2013/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011124808 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552542 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552542 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61B19/02, G08B21/02, G08B25/01, G08B25/08, G06F19/00, A62C37/50, A61F17/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A61B5/747 (EP,US);
A61B50/10 (EP,US);
A61N1/3904 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A61N1/3993 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | 19.09.2012 | ME | 19.09.2012 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN ZUGANG ZU EINER HILFS- UND NOTFALLSAUSRÜSTUNG SOWIE SYSTEM MIT DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACCESS TO AN ITEM OF ASSISTANCE AND EMERGENCY HARDWARE, AND A SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING SUCH DEVICES. | [2013/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCES A UN MATERIEL D'ASSISTANCE ET DE SECOURS, ET UN SYSTEME METTANT EN OEUVRE DE TELS DISPOSITIFS. | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2011 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | RS | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | GB | 24.03.2015 | IE | 24.03.2015 | IT | 24.03.2015 | LU | 24.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/35] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2015 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IT | 24.03.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003025602 (MEDEMA DOUGLAS K [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0004] - [0008]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202004002106U (VITAPHONE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figure . *; | [A]US2005006109 (MCSHEFFREY BRENDAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0043] - [0056] - [0060]; figures 1,2,8 *; | [Y]US2006149323 (MERRY RANDY L [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0039] - [0097]; figures 1-3 * * en particulier alinéa [0069] et fig. 3 *; | [IY]US2006215024 (COONCE CHARLES K [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0030] , [0031] , [0035] - [0044] - [0051] - [0078]; figures 1-5c * [Y] 4,9; | [Y]US2006250271 (ZIMMERMAN LARRY [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] - [0031] , [0032] , [0036] - [0039]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2006149323 | US2006215024 | US2006250271 |