EP2553999 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING WIRELESS TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILDH, Gunnar Kontrastvägen 28 S-192 55Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
ÖSTERGAARD, Jessica Fatburs Kvarngata 4 S-118 64 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
TIMUS, Bogdan Småbjörksvägen 9 S-163 42 Spånga / SE | 04 /
MOBERG, Peter Timotejgatan 7 S-118 59 Stockholm / SE | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11718498.6 | 01.04.2011 | WO2011IB51414 | Priority number, date | US20100320039P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 320039 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011121575 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553999 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/15542 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZEITPLANUNG DRAHTLOSER ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2013/06] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING WIRELESS TRANSMISSIONS | [2013/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PROGRAMMATION DE TRANSMISSIONS SANS FIL | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/49] | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009095814 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 5,17,26 * abstract * * paragraph [0059]; figure 5 *; | [XY]WO2010013962 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-16,22-25,27-38 * abstract * [Y] 5,17,26; | [A]WO2010013980 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-17,22-38 * abstract *; | EP2306661 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0120]; figures 1,4-18; claims 1,11 *; | EP2309813 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * page 9, line 13 - page 11, line 7; figures 11-19 *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on Resource Allocation for Relay Backhaul Link", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090790, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318647 [A] 1-17,22-38 * 2.2 Dynamic Resource Allocation Scheme * | by applicant | WO2009095814 | WO2010013962 |