EP2569815 - FUEL CELL STACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFC Energy plc Finsgate 5-7 Cranwood Street London EC1V 9EE / GB | [2014/14] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states AFC Energy Plc. Finsgate 5-7 Cranwood Street London EC1V 9EE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Martin Flat 3 10-12 Petworth Road Haslemere GU27 2HR / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2013/12] | 01 /
THOMAS, Martin c/o AFC Energy plc Unit 71.4 Dunsford Park Cranleigh Surrey GU6 8TB / GB | Representative(s) | Mansfield, Peter Turquand Coller IP Management Limited Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford, Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | [2013/12] | Application number, filing date | 11718772.4 | 09.05.2011 | WO2011GB50887 | Priority number, date | GB20100007858 | 11.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201007858 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141727 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569815 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569815 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/08, H01M8/24 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H01M8/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/083 (EP,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/2457 (EP);
H01M8/2459 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL | [2013/12] | English: | FUEL CELL STACKS | [2013/12] | French: | EMPILEMENTS DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2011 | AL | 02.04.2014 | AT | 02.04.2014 | BE | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | IE | 09.05.2014 | LU | 09.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MK | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9912220 (RMG SERVICES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 21; figures 6,7 * [Y] 5 [I] 7,8; | [XI]EP0107396 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 17, line 10 - page 21, line 4; figures 8-11 * [I] 7,8; | [I]JPS59217958 (FUJI DENKI SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al) [I] 1-3,7,8 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2008116248 (REDFLOW PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 5 * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 2; figure 8 * | by applicant | WO9912220 | EP0107396 | JPS59217958 | WO2008116248 |